Wells v. Amazon Data Services, Inc
Plaintiff: Alfonso Wells
Defendant: Amazon Data Services, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00630
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/28/20. (klau, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex Perilstein and Certification of Local Counsel Jocelyn R. Cuttino by Amazon Data Services, Inc. (Cuttino, Jocelyn)
July 28, 2020 Notice of Correction re #14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex Perilstein and Certification of Local Counsel Jocelyn R. Cuttino Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7317958. , The filing user has been notified that document #14 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document.(klau, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 Document filed in error and removed re Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex Perilstein and Certification of Local Counsel Jocelyn R. Cuttino Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7317958. by Amazon Data Services, Inc. (Cuttino, Jocelyn) (Main Document 14 replaced on 7/28/2020) (klau, ). Modified text on 7/28/2020 (klau, ).
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon Data Services, Inc. (Cuttino, Jocelyn)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Amazon Data Services, Inc.(Cuttino, Jocelyn)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Amended Complaint . The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is extended from July 10, 2020 to July 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa C. Buchanan on 7/9/2020. Amazon Data Services, Inc answer due 7/24/2020. (lcre, ) Modified on 7/9/2020 (lcre, ).
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Amended Complaint by Amazon Data Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cuttino, Jocelyn)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 6/29/20. (klau, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfonso Wells as to All Defendants , served on 6/19/20, answer due 7/10/20 (Taylor, Alexander) Modified on 6/26/2020 served and answer due date (klau, ).
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles T. Tucker Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Alexander L. Taylor Jr. by Alfonso Wells. (Taylor, Alexander)
June 25, 2020 Notice of Correction re #6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles T. Tucker Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Alexander L. Taylor Jr. The signature are signed on the wrong signature block, the filing user has been notified and refile the document. (klau, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles T. Tucker Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Alexander L. Taylor Jr. by Alfonso Wells. (Taylor, Alexander)
June 23, 2020 Notice of Correction re #5 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles T. Tucker Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Alexander L. Taylor Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7263310. An incomplete illegible, document was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the form only. (klau, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles T. Tucker Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Alexander L. Taylor Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7263310. by Alfonso Wells. (Taylor, Alexander)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued for Amended Complaint for service by SPS as to Amazon Data Services, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the original complaint and Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Alfonso Wells. (Taylor, Alexander)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amazon Data Services, Inc, filed by Alfonso Wells.(Taylor, Alexander) Modified text on 6/8/2020 (klau, ).
June 5, 2020 Notice of Correction: The filer has been notified and requested to refile proposed summons using the correct event. (aott)
June 5, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (aott)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7234198.), filed by Alfonso Wells. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Taylor, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Amazon Data Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Data Services, Inc
Represented By: Jocelyn Renee Cuttino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Wells
Represented By: Alexander Leonard Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?