Johnson v. Global Language Center
Plaintiff: Leila Catherine Johnson
Defendant: Global Language Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv00631
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leila Catherine Johnson. Global Language Center waiver sent on 6/10/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Pershing, Stephen)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Cosmos Monica, Jr on behalf of Global Language Center (Monica, John)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Global Language Center. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint , by Leila Catherine Johnson. (Pershing, Stephen)
June 5, 2020 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file the summons separately using the Proposed Summons event. (dvanm, )
June 4, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7234209.), filed by Leila Catherine Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Pershing, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Global Language Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Language Center
Represented By: John Cosmos Monica, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila Catherine Johnson
Represented By: Stephen Barkai Pershing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?