Brucker v. Copper River Shared Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hubert Benjamin Brucker
Defendant: Alaska Native General Serices, LLC and Copper River Shared Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00738
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Case Stayed (yguy)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: For the reasons stated during an on-the-record telephone conference with counsel for both parties present, defendants' Motion for Abstention [Dkt. No. 6] is GRANTED; and it is hereby ORDERED that this action be and is STAYED pending resolution of Alaska Native General Services. LLC and Copper River Shared Services. LLC v. Hubert Benjamin Brucker, No. CL 2020-9258, Circuit Court of Fairfax County, Virginia. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/21/20. (yguy)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held(via TELECONFERENCE) on 7/21/2020. Appearances of counsel. Court advised of case status. Deft #6 MOTION for Abstention is argued and GRANTED. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy,
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 Reply to #6 MOTION for Abstention Reply in Further Support of Motion for Abstention filed by Alaska Native General Serices, LLC, Copper River Shared Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cunningham, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Opposition to #6 MOTION for Abstention filed by Hubert Benjamin Brucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zech, Kristin)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing that plaintiff's response to defendant's motion is due by close of business Friday, July 17, 2020, and reply brief is due by close of business Monday, July 20, 2020; directing that the July 21, 2020 hearing will be conducted at 10:30 am telephonically and on the record;. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/14/2020. (see order for details)(shea)
July 14, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Abstention. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Sue Reigle on behalf of Alaska Native General Serices, LLC, Copper River Shared Services LLC (Reigle, Abigail)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariam Wagih Tadros on behalf of Alaska Native General Serices, LLC, Copper River Shared Services LLC (Tadros, Mariam)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing Date set for 07/21/2020 re #6 MOTION for Abstention (Cunningham, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION for Abstention filed by Alaska Native General Serices, LLC, Copper River Shared Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cunningham, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Abstention by Alaska Native General Serices, LLC, Copper River Shared Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Robert)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alaska Native General Serices, LLC, Copper River Shared Services LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (shea)
July 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Declan C. Leonard on behalf of Hubert Benjamin Brucker (Leonard, Declan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Copper River Shared Service, LLC by Hubert Benjamin Brucker. (Zech, Kristin) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/6/2020) (shea, ).
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Alaska Native General Services LLC by Hubert Benjamin Brucker. (Zech, Kristin) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/6/2020) (shea, ).
July 2, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (jlan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7282538.), filed by Hubert Benjamin Brucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zech, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brucker v. Copper River Shared Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Benjamin Brucker
Represented By: Kristin Anne Martin Zech
Represented By: Declan C. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Native General Serices, LLC
Represented By: Mariam Wagih Tadros
Represented By: Robert J. Cunningham, Jr.
Represented By: Abigail Sue Reigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper River Shared Services LLC
Represented By: Mariam Wagih Tadros
Represented By: Robert J. Cunningham, Jr.
Represented By: Abigail Sue Reigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?