5 Star Life Insurance Company v. Vincent et al
Plaintiff: 5 Star Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Winslow Grant Wacker, Christopher Shawn Wacker, William Grant Wacker, Brian Curtis Wacker and Donna Marie Vincent
Case Number: 1:2020cv00739
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. Donna Marie Vincent waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Wright, Gibson)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 Letter and check for interpleader deposit received on 8/3/2020. (shea)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. Christopher Shawn Wacker waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Wright, Gibson)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335); directing that Plaintiff shall deposit with the Clerk of the Court the entire balance of the life insurance benefit it holds that is now payable under the group life insurance policy of which William Bradley Wacker, deceased, was member. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/23/2020. (see order for details)(c/m 7/23/2020 shea)
July 23, 2020 Notice of Correction re #8 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (shea)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 Brief in Support to #8 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Donna Marie Vincent, Brian Curtis Wacker, Christopher Shawn Wacker, William Grant Wacker, Winslow Grant Wacker. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to William Grant Wacker by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Christopher Shawn Wacker by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Brian Curtis Wacker by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Winslow Grant Wacker by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Donna Marie Vincent by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 2, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (jlan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7282817.), filed by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Plaintiff Financial Interest Disclosure Statement)(Wright, Gibson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 5 Star Life Insurance Company v. Vincent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winslow Grant Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Shawn Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Grant Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Curtis Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Marie Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5 Star Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?