Rosser v. Clarke
Plaintiff: Sean Kirby Rosser
Defendant: Harold W. Clarke
Case Number: 1:2020cv00801
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Mail sent to Sean Kirby Rosser Returned as Undeliverable. (dvanm, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that this action be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as having been improvidently opened. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/24/2020. (dvanm, c/m 7/24/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm, c/m 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Harold W. Clarke, filed by Sean Kirby Rosser. (Attachments: #1 Data Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosser v. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Kirby Rosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold W. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?