White v. Todd et al
Plaintiff: Shawn W. White
Defendant: Todd, lackey and Shildt
Case Number: 1:2020cv00803
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Dkt. No. 4] be and is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 be and is conditionally granted to the extent that plaintiff need not prepay the filing fee at this time. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/13/2020. (dvanm, c/m 8/13/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Letter MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shawn W. White. (dvanm, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm, c/m 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shawn W. White. (dvanm, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Shildt, Todd, lackey, filed by Shawn W. White. (Attachments: #1 Data Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dvanm, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/17/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/17/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2020) (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Todd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn W. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shildt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?