Castillo, et al. v. The French Bread Factory, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gregorio Castillo and Fernando Gonzalez
Defendant: The French Bread Factory, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00830
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The French Bread Factory, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (klau, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to The French Bread Factory, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
July 23, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Gregorio Castillo. (Curwood, Craig)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against The French Bread Factory, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7313796.), filed by Gregorio Castillo. Fernando Gonzalez. Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curwood, Craig) Modified text on 7/23/2020 to add filer(klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo, et al. v. The French Bread Factory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The French Bread Factory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Castillo
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Gonzalez
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?