DAHMAN v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: Mohamed Elsayed Abdelaz Dahman
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf, DHS, Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, II, USCIS, Kimberly Zanotti and Administrative Appeals Office
Case Number: 1:2020cv00858
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; dismissing this action. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/16/2020. (see order for details)(shea)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Administrative Appeals Office, Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, II, DHS, USCIS, Chad F. Wolf, Kimberly Zanotti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barghaan, Dennis)
August 31, 2020 Filing 20 Waiver of re #18 Reply to Motion, #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Waiver of Hearing by Mohamed Elsayed Abdelaz Dahman (Caruso, Aaron)
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mohamed Elsayed Abdelaz Dahman. (Caruso, Aaron)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 Reply to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mohamed Elsayed Abdelaz Dahman. (Caruso, Aaron)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 Waiver of re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Oral Argument) by Administrative Appeals Office, Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, II, DHS, USCIS, Chad F. Wolf, Kimberly Zanotti (Barghaan, Dennis)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Administrative Appeals Office, Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, II, DHS, USCIS, Chad F. Wolf, Kimberly Zanotti. (Barghaan, Dennis)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Administrative Appeals Office, Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, II, DHS, USCIS, Chad F. Wolf, Kimberly Zanotti. (Barghaan, Dennis)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr on behalf of Administrative Appeals Office, Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, II, DHS, USCIS, Chad F. Wolf, Kimberly Zanotti (Barghaan, Dennis)
July 27, 2020 Notification of transfer of Petition for Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition from the District of Columbia 1:20cv241 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-00241. Original file and docket sheet received.
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #9 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case is brought by a resident of Alexandria, Virginia, challenging a decision issued in Fairfax, Virginia by the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. It has no meaningful connection to the District of Columbia, and transfer is proper under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint within 21 days of the case being placed on the electronic docket in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/15/2020. (lcrjl1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case , #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by ADMINISTRATIVE APPEALS OFFICE, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, DHS, USCIS, CHAD F. WOLF, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case , #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by MOHAMED ELSAYED ABDELAZ DAHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caruso, Aaron) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by ADMINISTRATIVE APPEALS OFFICE, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, DHS, USCIS, CHAD F. WOLF, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case by ADMINISTRATIVE APPEALS OFFICE, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, DHS, USCIS, CHAD F. WOLF, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATIVE APPEALS OFFICE, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, DHS, USCIS, CHAD F. WOLF, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI filed by MOHAMED ELSAYED ABDELAZ DAHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Caruso, Aaron) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ronald D. Richey, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7156482. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOHAMED ELSAYED ABDELAZ DAHMAN (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Caruso, Aaron) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing re #1 Complaint, by MOHAMED ELSAYED ABDELAZ DAHMAN. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/26/20. (lcrjl1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to ADMINISTRATIVE APPEALS OFFICE, KEN CUCCINELLI, DHS, USCIS, CHAD WOLF, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by MOHAMED ELSAYED ABDELAZ DAHMAN #1 Complaint,, filed by MOHAMED ELSAYED ABDELAZ DAHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected p.1 Complaint)(Caruso, Aaron) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATIVE APPEALS OFFICE, KEN CUCCINELLI, DHS, USCIS, CHAD WOLF, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6779238) filed by MOHAMED ELSAYED ABDELAZ DAHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons US DHS, #10 Summons USCIS AAO, #11 Summons CUCCINELLI, #12 Summons ZANOTTI, #13 Summons USCIS, #14 Summons WOLF)(Caruso, Aaron) . [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAHMAN v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, II
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Zanotti
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Appeals Office
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Elsayed Abdelaz Dahman
Represented By: Aaron Robert Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?