Thaler v Iancu, et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Thaler
Defendant: Andrei Iancu and United States Patent and Trademark Office
Case Number: 1:2020cv00903
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on General Counsel United States Patent and Trademark Office on 09/14/2020, filed by Stephen Thaler. (Neri, Geoffrey)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Attorney General of the United States Main Justice Building on 09/11/2020, filed by Stephen Thaler. (Neri, Geoffrey)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Andrei Iancu on 09/14/2020, filed by Stephen Thaler. (Neri, Geoffrey)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on States Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia on 09/03/2020, filed by Stephen Thaler. (Neri, Geoffrey)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrei Iancu, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re USPTO by Stephen Thaler. (Neri, Geoffrey)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re DA by Stephen Thaler. (Neri, Geoffrey)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re AG by Stephen Thaler. (Neri, Geoffrey)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Patent and Trademark Office. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
August 10, 2020 Notice of Correction re #3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Abbott and Certification of Local Counsel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7343216. Filing user notified to refile document after saving/printing to PDF. (dvanm, )
August 9, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Abbott and Certification of Local Counsel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7343216. by Stephen Thaler. (Neri, Geoffrey) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/10/2020) (dvanm, ).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Stephen Thaler. (Neri, Geoffrey)
August 6, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7340551.), filed by Stephen Thaler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neri, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thaler v Iancu, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Thaler
Represented By: Geoffrey Alex Neri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Patent and Trademark Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?