Nobrega v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Sharon Nobrega
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc., Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, District 2-13, Virginia Office, Communications Workers of America and Communications Workers of America, Local 2252
Case Number: 1:2020cv00904
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Stay. The Answer or other responsive pleading of the Defendants is hereby stayed until January 15, 2021. The Court will issue its Scheduling Order thereafter. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/29/2020. (lcre, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Linda M. Martin and Certification of Local Counsel Mark Hanna Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7422439. by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, Communications Workers of America, Local 2252, District 2-13, Virginia Office, Communications Workers of America. (Hanna, Mark)
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy B.G. Lassen and Certification of Local Counsel Mark Hanna Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7422428. by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, Communications Workers of America, Local 2252, District 2-13, Virginia Office, Communications Workers of America. (Hanna, Mark)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Hanna on behalf of Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, Communications Workers of America, Local 2252, District 2-13, Virginia Office, Communications Workers of America (Hanna, Mark)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Sharon Nobrega re #16 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Notice of Waiver of Hearing) (Gilliard, Gerald)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Sharon Nobrega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gilliard, Gerald)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Sharon Nobrega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilliard, Gerald)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Nobrega. Communications Workers of America, Local 2252 waiver sent on 9/13/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Gilliard, Gerald)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Nobrega. District 2-13, Virginia Office, Communications Workers of America waiver sent on 9/13/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Gilliard, Gerald)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Nobrega. Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO waiver sent on 9/13/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Gilliard, Gerald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Nobrega. American Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Gilliard, Gerald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT Per Order (ECF No. 10) against All Defendants, filed by Sharon Nobrega.(Gilliard, Gerald)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file corrected amended complaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/26/2020. (lcre, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 NOTICE filed by Sharon Nobrega. (Gilliard, Gerald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 NOTICE by Sharon Nobrega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilliard, Gerald)
August 25, 2020 Notice of Correction: Filer has been notified to request leave to file corrected amended complaint using the motions events provided re #6 NOTICE (lcre, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc., Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, Communications Workers of America, Local 2252, District 2-13, Virginia Office, Communications Workers of America. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(lcre, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sharon Nobrega re #3 Amended Complaint, (Notice of Errata) (Attachments: #1 Corrected Complaint, #2 Redline of Corrected Complanit)(Gilliard, Gerald)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Sharon Nobrega re #4 NOTICE, (Supplemental Notice of Right to Trial by Magistrate Judge) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Trial by Magistrate Judge)(Gilliard, Gerald)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Sharon Nobrega (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - American Airlines, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons - Communications Workers of America, #3 Proposed Summons - District 2-13 - Communications Workers of America, Virginia Office, #4 Proposed Summons - Communications Workers of America)(Gilliard, Gerald)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc., Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, District 2-13, Virginia Office, Communications Workers of America, Communications Workers of America, Local 2252, filed by Sharon Nobrega.(Gilliard, Gerald)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Sharon Nobrega re #1 Complaint (Gilliard, Gerald)
August 7, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lcre, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7340553.), filed by Sharon Nobrega. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilliard, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nobrega v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Sharon Nobrega
Represented By: Gerald Leroy Gilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Mark Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District 2-13, Virginia Office, Communications Workers of America
Represented By: Mark Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communications Workers of America, Local 2252
Represented By: Mark Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?