McIntosh v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chanell Mcintosh
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC, Individually And As Successor In Interest To Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Women's Health Inc., Indvidiually, And As Successor In Interest To, Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00921
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 STATE COURT RECORD received from USDC-EDPA. (One set of document with rubber band and placed in Civil File Room) (klau, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Tobias L. Millrood. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 09/22/2020. (dvanm, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Tobias L. Millrood and Certification of Local Counsel Brielle M. Hunt Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7406572. by Chanell Mcintosh. (Hunt, Brielle)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Barrett James Enix on behalf of Chanell Mcintosh (Enix, Barrett)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Phelan on behalf of Chanell Mcintosh (Phelan, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brielle Marie Hunt on behalf of Chanell Mcintosh (Hunt, Brielle)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/4/2020. (rban, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Frederick Michael Erny and Certification of Local Counsel Kelly M. Lippincott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7380432. by Coopersurgical, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Women's Health Inc., Indvidiually, And As Successor In Interest To, Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lippincott, Kelly)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Marie Lippincott on behalf of Coopersurgical, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Women's Health Inc., Indvidiually, And As Successor In Interest To, Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Individually And As Successor In Interest To Teva Women's Health, Inc. (Lippincott, Kelly)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03815. Original file and docket sheet received.
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1404(a) TO U.S.D.C. FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/11/20. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) 8/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. "NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTY"(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC. , COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 200400229, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14473783), filed by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDVIDIUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 8/6/2020 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntosh v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC, Individually And As Successor In Interest To Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Kelly Marie Lippincott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Kelly Marie Lippincott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Kelly Marie Lippincott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Kelly Marie Lippincott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health Inc., Indvidiually, And As Successor In Interest To, Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Rubenstein
Represented By: Kelly Marie Lippincott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Marie Lippincott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanell Mcintosh
Represented By: Kara D. Hill
Represented By: Tobias Millrood
Represented By: Brielle Marie Hunt
Represented By: Barrett James Enix
Represented By: Michael G. Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?