AMAYA HERNANDEZ v. Executive Office for Immigration Review et al
Plaintiff: YENNY AMAYA HERNANDEZ
Defendant: US Attorney, William Barr, USCIS and Executive Office for Immigration Review
Case Number: 1:2020cv00924
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 So Ordered re #7 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss filed by YENNY AMAYA HERNANDEZ. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/6/2020. (lcre, )
October 5, 2020 Notice of Correction: Filer has been notified to file a notice of hearing or waiver of oral argument re #7 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss (lcre, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by YENNY AMAYA HERNANDEZ. (Yacub, Ivan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by William Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Attorney, USCIS re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of Waiver of Oral Argument (Spavins, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by William Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Attorney, USCIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Spavins, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by William Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Attorney, USCIS. (Spavins, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Spavins on behalf of William Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Attorney, USCIS (Spavins, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Attorney, USCIS. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(lcre, )
August 14, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lcre, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint FOIA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7353456.), filed by YENNY AMAYA HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Summons EOIR, #7 Proposed Summons USCIS, #8 Proposed Summons USAG, #9 Proposed Summons US Attorney)(Yacub, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMAYA HERNANDEZ v. Executive Office for Immigration Review et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YENNY AMAYA HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Ivan Yacub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?