Garrett v. Saul
Plaintiff: Valentina Garrett
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00930
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Office of General Counsel,Social Security Administration, Region III. (dvanm, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. USAO served on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (dvanm, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/26/2020. (rban, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David F. Chermol and Certification of Local Counsel Robert W. Gillikin, II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7365073. by Valentina Garrett. (Gillikin, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and given to USMS for service. (rban, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Sealed ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/19/2020. (rban, copy mailed )
August 17, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION In Forma Pauperis re #1 Complaint by Valentina Garrett. (Gillikin, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons all 3 summonses with Form 285s by Valentina Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Form 285s)(Gillikin, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Andrew Saul , filed by Valentina Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Garrett
Represented By: Robert Wayne Gillikin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?