Buyuk v. Kuvvatov et al
Plaintiff: Ozkan Buyuk
Defendant: Fayzullo Kuvvatov and DMV Auto Finance LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00943
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DMV Auto Finance LLC, Fayzullo Kuvvatov. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Fayzullo Kuvvatov by Ozkan Buyuk. (Doerrer, Stan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint DMV Auto Finance LLC by Ozkan Buyuk. (Doerrer, Stan)
August 28, 2020 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that documents 2 & 3 are incorrectly saved PDF fillable forms and have been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the documents. (dvanm, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Fayzullo Kuvvatov by Ozkan Buyuk. (Doerrer, Stan) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/28/2020) (dvanm, ).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint DMV Auto Finance LLC by Ozkan Buyuk. (Doerrer, Stan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/28/2020) (dvanm, ).
August 18, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7356167.), filed by Ozkan Buyuk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Doerrer, Stan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buyuk v. Kuvvatov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayzullo Kuvvatov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMV Auto Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozkan Buyuk
Represented By: Stan Michael Doerrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?