Langert v. George Mason University
Plaintiff: Haley Langert
Defendant: George Mason University, Juan Carlos Iturregui, Horace Blackman, Jon M. Patterson, Denise Turner Roth, James W. Hazel, Mehmood S. Kazmi, Bob Witeck, Paul J. Reagan, Carolyn J. Moss, Ignacia S. Moreno, Wendy Marquez, Edward H. Rice, Simmi Bhuller, Thomas M. Davis, Anjan Chimaladinne and Nancy Gibson Prowitt
Case Number: 1:2020cv00944
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/13/2020. (lcre, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) by Haley Langert. (Williams, Charles)
October 1, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2020 at 10:00 AM via ZOOM before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
September 30, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
September 30, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 2/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled in this matter for Friday, October 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Wednesday, November 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom videoconferencing. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/29/2020. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Anthony J Trenga.(lcre, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 23, 2020 re #10 Memorandum in Support, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Schlam, Eli)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Simmi Bhuller, Horace Blackman, Anjan Chimaladinne, Thomas M. Davis, George Mason University, James W. Hazel, Juan Carlos Iturregui, Mehmood S. Kazmi, Wendy Marquez, Ignacia S. Moreno, Carolyn J. Moss, Jon M. Patterson, Nancy Gibson Prowitt, Paul J. Reagan, Edward H. Rice, Denise Turner Roth, Bob Witeck. (Schlam, Eli)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Simmi Bhuller, Horace Blackman, Anjan Chimaladinne, Thomas M. Davis, George Mason University, James W. Hazel, Juan Carlos Iturregui, Mehmood S. Kazmi, Wendy Marquez, Ignacia S. Moreno, Carolyn J. Moss, Jon M. Patterson, Nancy Gibson Prowitt, Paul J. Reagan, Edward H. Rice, Denise Turner Roth, Bob Witeck. (Schlam, Eli)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed George Mason University waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lcre, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice of Gary Francis Lynch. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/23/2020. (lcre, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice of Edward William Ciolko. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/23/2020. (lcre, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice Nicholas Anthony Colella. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/23/2020. (lcre, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary Francis Lynch and Certification of Local Counsel Charles L. Williams Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7414036. by Haley Langert. (Williams, Charles)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward William Ciolko and Certification of Local Counsel Charles L. Williams Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7414034. by Haley Langert. (Williams, Charles)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Anthony Colella and Certification of Local Counsel Charles L. Williams Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7414030. by Haley Langert. (Williams, Charles)
August 18, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lcre, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7355902.), filed by Haley Langert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langert v. George Mason University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Langert
Represented By: Charles Lewis Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Mason University
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Carlos Iturregui
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Blackman
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon M. Patterson
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Turner Roth
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Hazel
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehmood S. Kazmi
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Witeck
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Reagan
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn J. Moss
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ignacia S. Moreno
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Marquez
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward H. Rice
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmi Bhuller
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Davis
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anjan Chimaladinne
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Gibson Prowitt
Represented By: Eli Samuel Schlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?