Richman Technology Corporation v. ADT LLC
Plaintiff: Richman Technology Corporation
Defendant: ADT LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00979
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 3/12/2021.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(awac, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by ADT LLC.(Rusnak, Eric)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is granted in part and the new response date for ADT to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is October 8, 2020. (three-week extension). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 09/18/2020. (wgar, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Rusnak, Eric)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT LLC. (Rusnak, Eric)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Christopher Rusnak on behalf of ADT LLC (Rusnak, Eric)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Report on the filing or determination of a Patent action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(aott)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Richman Technology Corporation AO 120, Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ADT LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(aott, )
August 21, 2020 Notice of Correction- The filing user has been notified and asked to prepare and file the AO 120, Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form. (aott)
August 21, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Richman Technology Corporation. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richman Technology Corporation. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Richman Technology Corporation (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7361775.), filed by Richman Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richman Technology Corporation v. ADT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC
Represented By: Eric Christopher Rusnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richman Technology Corporation
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?