Moisiuk v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Roman Moisiuk
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf, Director Christopher A. Wray, USCIS District Direc Sarah Taylor, US Attorney General William P. Barr, US Attorney for East G. Zachary Terwilliger, Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Christopher A. Wray, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, William P. Barr, Chad F. Wolf, G. Zachary Terwilliger and Sarah Taylor
Case Number: 1:2020cv00995
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Moisiuk. G. Zachary Terwilliger served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Krukova, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Moisiuk. Chad F. Wolf served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Christopher A. Wray served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(Krukova, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Moisiuk. William P. Barr served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Sarah Taylor served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service)(Krukova, Elizabeth)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Sarah Taylor, G. Zachary Terwilliger, Chad F. Wolf, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
August 26, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by Roman Moisiuk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Krukova, Elizabeth)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7370867.), filed by Roman Moisiuk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit #1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit #2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit #3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit #4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit #5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit #6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit #7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit #8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit #9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit #10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit #11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit #12)(Krukova, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moisiuk v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Moisiuk
Represented By: Elizabeth Krukova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS District Direc Sarah Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney for East G. Zachary Terwilliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Zachary Terwilliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?