BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. DGP Transport Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Manjit Deol, DGP Transport Inc., SR Truck Leasing Corp. and Manjinder Deol
Case Number: 1:2020cv00998
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. Manjit Deol served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Stewart, George)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. Manjinder Deol served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Stewart, George)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. SR Truck Leasing Corp. served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Stewart, George)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. DGP Transport Inc. served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Stewart, George)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to DGP Transport Inc., Manjinder Deol, Manjit Deol, SR Truck Leasing Corp.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea)
August 28, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (shea)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for SR Truck Leasing Corp. by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Manjit Deol by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Manjinder Deol by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for DGP Transport Inc. by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7372194.), filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, George) (Attachment 8 replaced on 8/28/2020) (shea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. DGP Transport Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manjit Deol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGP Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SR Truck Leasing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manjinder Deol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: George Edward Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?