The American Spectator Foundation, Inc. v. Press Holdings Media Group
Plaintiff: The American Spectator Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Press Holdings Media Group and The Spectator (1828) Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01024
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The American Spectator Foundation, Inc.. The Spectator (1828) Ltd. waiver sent on 10/16/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. (Coffey, John)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Spectator (1828) Ltd., filed by The American Spectator Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Coffey, John)
October 5, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Press Holdings Media Group answer due 10/19/2020. (lcre, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Press Holdings Media Group, c/o Shez Shafiq (CFO) on 09/28/2020, filed by The American Spectator Foundation, Inc.. (Coffey, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Press Holdings Media Group. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(lcre, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons by The American Spectator Foundation, Inc.. (Coffey, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark. (lcre, )(c/s)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by The American Spectator Foundation, Inc. Report on the Filing or determination of an action regarding trademark 4,603,953 (Coffey, John)
September 2, 2020 Notice of Correction : Filer has been notified to submit AO 120 Trademark Form(lcre, )
September 2, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lcre, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The American Spectator Foundation, Inc.. (Coffey, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7381395.), filed by The American Spectator Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (The American Spectator Trademark Registration), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coffey, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The American Spectator Foundation, Inc. v. Press Holdings Media Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Press Holdings Media Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Spectator (1828) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The American Spectator Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?