Reyes v. Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Blanca Reyes
Defendant: Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01045
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that the Consent Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that all deadlines in this case are stayed for thirty (30) days in order to allow the parties sufficient time to finalize their settlement. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/23/2020. (tran)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Stay by Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnsback, Michael)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc. answer due 10/23/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 10/14/2020. (dvanm, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement by Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc. (Barnsback, Michael) Modified to correct text on 10/14/2020 (dvanm, ).
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnsback, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #4 Amended Complaint by Blanca Reyes. (Sutter, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Blanca Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sutter, Matthew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(aott, )
September 8, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (aott, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Blanca Reyes. (Sutter, Matthew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7387080.), filed by Blanca Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Building Maintenance Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Earl Barnsback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Reyes
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?