New Management Services LLC et al v. newrngtservices.com et al
Plaintiff: Online Data Exchange LLC and New Management Services LLC
Defendant: e-oscar.net, newrngtservices.com, John Doe, eoscar.net, newmgrtservices.com and eoscar.com
Case Number: 1:2020cv01072
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order to Publish Notice of Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/03/2020. (choy, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of re #7 MOTION for Service by Publication Hearing by New Management Services LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC (Barnes, Attison)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by New Management Services LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Attison)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Service by Publication by New Management Services LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference shall be, and hereby is, GRANTED; that Plaintiffs may immediately serve Rule 45 subpoenas to PublicDomainRegistry, Dynadot, Above.com, Media Elite, Fundacion Privacy Services, and other providers of Internet services and/or financial institutions used and/or victimized by John Doe in furtherance of the scam described in the Complaint, sufficient to identify the name, address, telephone number, payment mechanism, and any additional email addresses or identifying attributes of Defendant John Doe; that Internet service providers that have provided services to Defendant John Doe are authorized to disclose identifying information for John Doe pursuant to 47 U.S.C. 551(c)(2)(B); that any information disclosed to Plaintiffs in response to a subpoena issued pursuant to this Order may be used solely for the purpose of protecting Plaintiffs rights as set forth in the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 09/24/2020. (choy, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of re #3 MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference Hearing by New Management Services LLC (Barnes, Attison)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by New Management Services LLC. (Barnes, Attison)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by New Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
September 11, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (choy, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by New Management Services LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC. (Barnes, Attison)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7395162.), filed by New Management Services LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Attison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Management Services LLC et al v. newrngtservices.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: e-oscar.net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: newrngtservices.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eoscar.net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: newmgrtservices.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eoscar.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Online Data Exchange LLC
Represented By: Attison Leonard Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Management Services LLC
Represented By: Attison Leonard Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?