Hoover v. Clarke
Petitioner: Malik Raheem Hoover
Respondent: H. Clarke
Case Number: 1:2020cv01107
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Notification of transfer of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus from the Western District of VA Case No. 7:20cv525 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:20-cv-00525. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order transferring case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/22/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/23/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Thomas T. Cullen for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(ham) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/23/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Malik R. Hoover. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover v. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Malik Raheem Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?