Ontel Products Corporation v. The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Plaintiff: Ontel Products Corporation
Defendant: The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2020cv01124
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 53 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A (lcre, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE of Service re #50 Request for Entry of Default as to Certain Defendants, #51 Declaration by Monica Riva Talley on behalf of Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
November 20, 2020 Filing 51 Declaration re #50 Request for Entry of Default as to Certain Defendants by Monica Riva Talley by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
November 20, 2020 Filing 50 Request for Entry of Default as to Certain Defendants by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Unseal Document #7 Sealed Document, #8 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), #11 Sealed Memorandum in Support, #15 Sealed Document, #9 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), #14 Sealed Memorandum in Support. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/13/2020. (lcre, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED as it concerns Defendant No. 69 Shu Ling Zhao (seller ID; mapletoday). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/13/2020. (lcre, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of Service re #41 NOTICE, #42 Declaration, #44 MOTION to Unseal Document #7 Sealed Document filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #8 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #11 Sealed Memorandum in Support filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #15 Sealed Do, #45 Memorandum in Support, #43 Stipulation of Dismissal, #46 Waiver of, by Monica Riva Talley on behalf of Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
November 10, 2020 Filing 46 Waiver of re #44 MOTION to Unseal Document #7 Sealed Document filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #8 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #11 Sealed Memorandum in Support filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #15 Sealed Do Hearing by Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
November 10, 2020 Filing 45 Memorandum in Support re #44 MOTION to Unseal Document #7 Sealed Document filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #8 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #11 Sealed Memorandum in Support filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #15 Sealed Do filed by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
November 10, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Unseal Document #7 Sealed Document filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #8 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #11 Sealed Memorandum in Support filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #15 Sealed Document filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #9 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) filed by Ontel Products Corporation, #14 Sealed Memorandum in Support filed by Ontel Products Corporation by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
November 10, 2020 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to a Certain Defendant by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
November 10, 2020 Filing 42 Declaration re #41 NOTICE of Service of Defendants by Email by Monica Talley by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
November 10, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE by Ontel Products Corporation re #21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Notice of Service of Defendants by Email (Talley, Monica)
October 29, 2020 Filing 40 Summons Issued as to The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(lcre, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ORDERED that PayPal shall continue to freeze all PayPal accounts associated with the Defendants identified in Schedule A to the Verified Complaint and restrain and enjoin the transfer of any monies held in such accounts until further ordered by this Court. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/29/20. (klau, )
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SO ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as it concerns Defendant No. 3 (seller ID: 2018happydeal), Defendant No. 8 (seller IDauckland0806), Defendant No. 12 (seller ID: bestbuydeals2020), Defendant No. 14 (seller ID blackgall2014). Defendant No. 44 (seller ID: hugurllfe). Defendant No. 45 (seller ID isabellaworld). Defendant No. 57 (seller ID: kaiya_49). Defendant No. 60 (seller ID: koyayu_0), and Defendant No. 84 (seller ID: 2019_2020). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/28/2020. (lcre, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Service re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #36 Proposed Summons, #34 Waiver of, #33 Memorandum in Support by Monica Riva Talley on behalf of Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
October 28, 2020 Filing 36 Proposed Summons by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
October 28, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
October 28, 2020 Filing 34 Waiver of re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
October 28, 2020 Filing 33 Memorandum in Support re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
October 28, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Temporary Restraining Order granted on September 30, 2020, which was scheduled to expire on October 14, 2020, is extended in effect until October 28, 2020. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/16/2020. (lcre, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Service re #27 Memorandum in Support, #26 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order, #28 Declaration, #29 Waiver of by Monica Riva Talley on behalf of Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
October 14, 2020 Filing 29 Waiver of re #26 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order Hearing by Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
October 14, 2020 Filing 28 Declaration re #26 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by Monica Riva Talley by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
October 14, 2020 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
October 14, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #10 Motion for TRO. ORDERED that PayPal shall immediately freeze all PayPal accounts associated with Defendants identified in Schedule A to the Verified Complaint and restrain and enjoin the transfer of any monies held in such accounts until further ordered by this Court (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/30/2020. (lcre, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/30/2020. (lcre, )
September 30, 2020 Per LO chambers motions set for 10/2/2020 on the pleadings (clar, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice of Nicholas John Nowak. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/29/2020. (lcre, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice of Daniel Steven Block. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/29/2020. (lcre, )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #13 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 9/28/2020. (lcre, )
September 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2020 at 10:00 via Teleconference before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Ontel Products Corporation re #1 Complaint AO 120 Trademark Form (Talley, Monica)
September 28, 2020 Notice of Correction : Filer has been notified to submit AO 120 Trademark Form re #1 Complaint (lcre, )
September 28, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lcre, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service re #7 Sealed Document, #8 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), #11 Sealed Memorandum in Support, #6 Waiver of, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C), #15 Sealed Document, #9 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), #1 Complaint, #14 Sealed Memorandum in Support, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement, #16 Waiver of, #17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas John Nowak and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7418294. , #3 MOTION to Seal , #12 Notice of Hearing Date, #18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Steven Block and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7418295. , #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #13 MOTION for Service by Email by Monica Riva Talley on behalf of Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Steven Block and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7418295. by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas John Nowak and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7418294. by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 Waiver of re #13 MOTION for Service by Email Hearing by Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 Sealed Document - Declaration of Monica Talley re #3 MOTION to Seal , #13 MOTION for Service by Email. (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Seal , #13 MOTION for Service by Email. (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Service by Email by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 2, 2020 re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Seal , #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) - Exhibit 3 to Complaint re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Seal . (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) - Exhibit 2 to Complaint re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #2 Supplement Exhibit 2 - Part 3, #3 Supplement Exhibit 2 - Part 4, #4 Supplement Exhibit 2 - Part 5)(Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 Sealed Document Schedule A to Complaint re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Seal . (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of re #3 MOTION to Seal Hearing by Ontel Products Corporation (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Ontel Products Corporation re #3 MOTION to Seal (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Seal filed by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ontel Products Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7418262.), filed by Ontel Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Talley, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ontel Products Corporation v. The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ontel Products Corporation
Represented By: Monica Riva Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?