Vangorder v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Megan S Vangorder and Megan S. Vangorder
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01147
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Third Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer; Defendant shall have up to and including December 14, 2020 to file its answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/25/2020. (jlan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension Third Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Samsel, Christine)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the #10 Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED . Defendant shall have up to and including November 30, 2020 to file its answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Megan S. Vangorder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/09/20. (pmil, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Second Consent Motion) by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Samsel, Christine)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/27/20. (pmil, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/27/20. (pmil, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Courtney Elizabeth Bartkus and Certification of Local Counsel Christine A. Samsel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7464929. by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Samsel, Christine)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Aaron Weiss and Certification of Local Counsel Christine A. Samsel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7464826. by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Samsel, Christine)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 So Ordered re: #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint to 11/09/20 filed by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/23/20. (pmil, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Samsel, Christine)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nelnet Servicing, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
September 30, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (pmil, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Megan S Vangorder. (Kelly, Kristi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7424798.), filed by Megan S Vangorder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Kristi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vangorder v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Christine Ann Samsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan S Vangorder
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan S. Vangorder
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?