Microsoft Corporation et al v. John Does 1 et al
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation and FS-ISAC, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 2 and John Does 1
Case Number: 1:2020cv01171
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE - ln light of the Court's General Order No. 2020-16, the Court will conduct the hearing scheduled for Tuesday, October 20, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. via videoconference. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/14/2020. (see order for details)(dvanm, c/m to plaintiff)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 32 EXPARTE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/14/2020. (dvanm, c/m to pltf)
October 14, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RULING ON MICROSOFT AND FS-ISAC'S EXPARTE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ON THE PAPERS by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation (dvanm, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Execution of Temporary Restraining Order by Microsoft Corporation (dvanm, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 30 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14683086753 (aott, )
October 7, 2020 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300. (aott, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 29 Report on the filing or determination of an action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Copy mailed to U.S. Copyright Office on 10/7/20) (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Set Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 10/20/2020 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (set per order #28 ) (dvanm, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Ex Parte and Under Seal ORDER granting #13 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (dvanm, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Richard Domingues Boscovich. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/6/2020. (dvanm, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Gabriel M. Ramsey. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/6/2020. (dvanm, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Kayvan M. Ghaffari. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/6/2020. (dvanm, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Jacob Canter. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/06/2020. (dvanm, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order Temporarily Sealing Documents. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/06/2020. (dvanm, c/m to plaintiff)
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Submission - Exhibit 21 to #21 Declaration of Kayvan M. Ghaffari in Support re #13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 28, #8 Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibit 30, #10 Exhibit 31, #11 Exhibit 32, #12 Exhibit 33, #13 Exhibit 34, #14 Exhibit 35, #15 Exhibit 36, #16 Exhibit 37, #17 Exhibit 38, #18 Exhibit 40)(klau, ) Modified on 10/6/2020 Exhibit 39 is not included/provided by counsel (klau, ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 Declaration of Kayvan M. Ghaffari in Support re #13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 Declaration of Steven Silberstein in Support re #13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 Declaration of Jean-Ian Boutin in Support re #13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Kevin Garlow in Support re #13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 Declaration of Vikram Thakur in Support re #13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Rodelio G. Finones in Support re #13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Jason B. Lyons in Support re #13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 Brief in Support to #13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction filed by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION/Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Domingues Boscovich and Certification of Local Counsel Julie Milewski Filing fee $ 75. by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabriel M. Ramsey and Certification of Local Counsel Julie Milewski Filing fee $ 75. by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kayvan M. Ghaffari and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski Filing fee $ 75. by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Canter and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski Filing fee $ 75. by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Gabriel M. Ramsey in Support re #5 MOTION to Seal by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Brief in Support to #5 MOTION to Seal filed by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION For Protective Order Temporarily Sealing Documents by FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by FS-ISAC, Inc.. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Microsoft Corporation. (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Rebecca Milewski on behalf of FS-ISAC, Inc., Microsoft Corporation (klau, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does 1, John Does 2 (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Microsoft Corporation, FS-ISAC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Letter)(klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation et al v. John Does 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Julia Rebecca Milewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS-ISAC, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Rebecca Milewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?