Nesbit et al v. Arase et al
Plaintiff: Paul Nesbit and Barry Wells
Defendant: Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group and Martin Arase
Case Number: 1:2020cv01217
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:20-cv-00430. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER on Stipulation to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia re #30 Stipulation filed by Barry Wells, Paul Nesbit. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 10/14/2020. (kpf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Jason D. Haymore filed by Jason D. Haymore on behalf of Paul Nesbit (Haymore, Jason) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Dawn W. Emery filed by Dawn W. Emery on behalf of Paul Nesbit (Emery, Dawn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION to Transfer Venue by Paul Nesbit, Barry Wells. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarrett, Jack) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2020 re #18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support MOTION for More Definite Statement and Memorandum in Support /MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE filed by Eagle Systems & Services, Susan Arase, The Columbia Group, Martin Arase. Detailed minute entry to follow pending Judge Jenkins' approval. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jack Jarrett, III, Dawn W. Emery, Attorney for Defendant: James Christopher Fontana, M. Christopher Moon. Court Reporter: Electronic/Rebecca Janke.(Time Start: 9:59:58, Time End: 10:04:55, Room 7.200.)(lnp) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support MOTION for More Definite Statement and Memorandum in Support /MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE filed by Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (D'Agostino, Louis) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jack Jarrett for Paul Nesbit,Jack Jarrett for Barry Wells.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 09/14/2020. (kpf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON MOTION re: #18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins.TELECONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS:Please plan to participate on a landline rather than a cell phone if possible. Also avoid the use of a speaker phone. During the call, announce your name each time you speak and pause regularly during any statements to allow the judge to maintain control. Mute your phone when you are not speaking. As a participant, the conference instructions are as follows: 1. Dial 888-684-88522. Enter Access Code 62703563. Enter the conference as a participant by pressing #key. If the call has not been activated by the Court, you will be placed on hold. 4. Once the call is activated you will be prompted to enter the participant security code 1007201 followed by the # key. You will now be entered into the conference. If you have any questions before the hearing begins please do not hesitate to contact chambers at 801-524-6507. If you are having issues during the hearing, you can email the courtroom deputy at Kim_Forsgren@utd.uscourts.gov. This hearing will be conducted telephonically. Members of the public, including media, are not able to attend in the courtroom and should contact the case manager at kathleen_smith@utd.uscourts.gov for information to obtain electronic access to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (kms) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 25 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re #18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support MOTION for More Definite Statement and Memorandum in Support /MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE filed by Plaintiff Paul Nesbit. (Emery, Dawn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jack Jarrett , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3714398,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Paul Nesbit. (Attachments: #1 Application Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Pro Hac Vice)(Emery, Dawn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. now been received. Case randomly assigned to District Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #14 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a Scheduling Order pursuant to Rule 26(f) within 20 days of the courts order denying the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/6/20. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order : to Amend Order to Propose Schedule filed by Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moon, M.) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support , MOTION for More Definite Statement and Memorandum in Support /MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE filed by Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Susan Arase, #2 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Martin Arase)(Moon, M.) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Louis James D'Agostino for Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services and The Columbia Group.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/30/20. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Christopher Fontana for Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services and The Columbia Group.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/30/20. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffry Ryan Cook for Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services and The Columbia Group.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/30/20. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group, Plaintiffs Paul Nesbit, Barry Wells. Form due by 8/14/2020. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Christopher Fontana , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3665007,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moon, M.) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Louis James D'Agostino , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3664999,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moon, M.) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffry Ryan Cook , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3664975,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moon, M.) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Christopher Moon on behalf of Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group (Moon, M.) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons and Complaint served on Ellen MacGregor on July 9, 2020, filed by Plaintiff Paul Nesbit. (Emery, Dawn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 ERRATA to #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Paul Nesbit and Barry Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email dated September 16, 2019, #2 Exhibit Letter dated September 19, 2019 to Arase and Perkins, #3 Exhibit Email dated July 12, 2019, #4 Exhibit Email dated July 18, 2019, #5 Exhibit Email dated October 21, 2019, #6 Exhibit Email dated October 3, 2019)(Emery, Dawn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 6/23/20. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Martin Arase. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Susan Arase. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eagle Systems & Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to The Columbia Group. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3621176) filed by Paul Nesbit. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Emery, Dawn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiffs Paul Nesbit, Barry Wells is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nesbit et al v. Arase et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Arase
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Represented By: James Christopher Fontana
Represented By: Jeffry Ryan Cook
Represented By: Louis James D'Agostino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Systems & Services
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Represented By: James Christopher Fontana
Represented By: Jeffry Ryan Cook
Represented By: Louis James D'Agostino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Columbia Group
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Represented By: James Christopher Fontana
Represented By: Jeffry Ryan Cook
Represented By: Louis James D'Agostino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Arase
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Represented By: James Christopher Fontana
Represented By: Jeffry Ryan Cook
Represented By: Louis James D'Agostino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Nesbit
Represented By: Jason D. Haymore
Represented By: Jack Bradley Jarrett, III
Represented By: Dawn W. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Wells
Represented By: Jason D. Haymore
Represented By: Jack Bradley Jarrett, III
Represented By: Dawn W. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?