Plastipak Packaging, Inc. v. Nestle Waters North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Plastipak Packaging, Inc.
Defendant: Nestle Waters North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01288
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 First MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/28/2020. (shea)
December 28, 2020 Filing 34 Notice of Hearing Date set for 01/22/2021 re #31 Memorandum in Support, #30 First MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Clay, Aaron)
December 23, 2020 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 First MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
December 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #30 First MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 32 Notice of Hearing Date re #30 First MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Clay, Aaron)
December 21, 2020 Filing 31 Memorandum in Support re #30 First MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clay, Aaron)
December 21, 2020 Filing 30 First MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Clay, Aaron)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER finding as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/14/2020. (see order for details)(shea)
December 9, 2020 Filing 28 Withdrawal of Motion by Nestle Waters North America, Inc. re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Clay, Aaron)
December 7, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Ahmed)
December 7, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nestle Waters North America, Inc., filed by Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Davis, Ahmed)
December 2, 2020 Per RDA chambers motions set for 12/18/2020 on the pleadings(clar, )
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Brooke Wilner. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/2/2020. (shea)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Kevin Rodkey. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/2/2020. (shea)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Tyler Akagi. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/2/2020. (shea)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Gerald Ivey. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/2/2020. (shea)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Virginia Louise Carron. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/2/2020. (shea)
November 24, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 20 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Clay, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Hearing Date set for December 18, 2020 re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Clay, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Clay, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clay, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brooke Wilner and Certification of Local Counsel Aaron Gleaton Clay Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7509942. by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Clay, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Rodkey and Certification of Local Counsel Aaron Gleaton Clay Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7509932. by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Clay, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Tyler Akagi and Certification of Local Counsel Aaron Gleaton Clay Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7509910. by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Clay, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerald Ivey and Certification of Local Counsel Aaron Gleaton Clay Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7509896. by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Clay, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Virginia Carron and Certification of Local Counsel Aaron Gleaton Clay Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7509878. by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Clay, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Gleaton Clay on behalf of Nestle Waters North America, Inc. (Clay, Aaron)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Whitney A. Reichel. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/13/2020. (shea)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Christopher R. Dillon. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/13/2020. (shea)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Gopenko on behalf of Plastipak Packaging, Inc. (Gopenko, Daniel)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Whitney A. Reichel and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed J. Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7482531. by Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. (Davis, Ahmed)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher R. Dillon and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed J. Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7482519. by Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. (Davis, Ahmed)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plastipak Packaging, Inc. Nestle Waters North America, Inc. served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020 (Davis, Ahmed)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the filing or determination of an action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint cont, #3 Complaint cont, #4 Complaint cont, #5 Complaint cont, #6 Complaint cont)(aott, )
October 30, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. (Davis, Ahmed)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7473059.), filed by Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Report on the FIling or Determination of an Action re Patent or Trademark Form AO120, #16 Plastipak Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Davis, Ahmed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plastipak Packaging, Inc. v. Nestle Waters North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plastipak Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: Ahmed Jamal Davis
Represented By: Daniel Robert Gopenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Waters North America, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Gleaton Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?