Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv01310
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Motion for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 11/13/20. (klau, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of re #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference Oral Arguments by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sciarrino, Dawn)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sciarrino, Dawn)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn)
November 4, 2020 Notice of Correction re [1-2] Civil Cover Sheet, The filing user has been notified that document (1-2) was incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (klau, )
November 4, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO 121 - Report on Filing of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sciarrino, Dawn) Modified on 11/4/2020 Copy mailed to Copyright Office.(klau, ).
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7479134.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2Document filed in error and removed re Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciarrino, Dawn) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (klau, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/4/2020) (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Dawn Marie Sciarrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?