Duale v. Roessler, et al
Plaintiff: Filsan Duale
Defendant: Edwin C. Roessler, Jr., Fairfax County Police Department, John Doe Police Officer 5, John Doe Police Officer 2, John Doe Police Officer 3, John Doe Police Officer 4, Brandon Vinson, John Doe Police Officer 1 and Sgt Joe. Shoemaker
Case Number: 1:2020cv01499
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 Brief in Support to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Reply Brief filed by Filsan Duale. (Ruhling, Billy)
January 26, 2021 Per RDA cambers motions set for 2/17/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
January 26, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date set for 02/17/2021 re #15 Memorandum in Support, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Baucom, Kimberly)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fairfax County Police Department, Edwin C. Roessler, Jr, Sgt Joe. Shoemaker. (Baucom, Kimberly)
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Fairfax County Police Department, Edwin C. Roessler, Jr, Sgt Joe. Shoemaker. (Baucom, Kimberly)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 Opposition to #12 Notice of Hearing Date, #11 Memorandum in Support, #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fairfax County Police Department, Edwin C. Roessler, Jr, Sgt Joe. Shoemaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baucom, Kimberly)
January 7, 2021 Per RDA Chambers motions set for 1/29/21 on papers. (klau, )
January 7, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr.. (klau, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Hearing Date of January 29, 2021 re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Ruhling, Billy)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Filsan Duale. (Ruhling, Billy)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Filsan Duale. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruhling, Billy)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Filsan Duale.(Ruhling, Billy)
December 28, 2020 Per RDA chambers motions set for 1/27/2021 on the pleadings. (clar, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing Date Corrected to 2021 re #7 Notice of Hearing Date (Baucom, Kimberly)
December 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
December 24, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date set for 01/27/2020 re #6 Memorandum in Support, #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Baucom, Kimberly)
December 24, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fairfax County Police Department, Edwin C. Roessler, Jr, Sgt Joe. Shoemaker. (Baucom, Kimberly)
December 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Fairfax County Police Department, Edwin C. Roessler, Jr, Sgt Joe. Shoemaker. (Baucom, Kimberly)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Miles Jarrad Wright on behalf of Filsan Duale (Wright, Miles)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Billy Bernard Ruhling, II on behalf of Filsan Duale (Ruhling, Billy)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Service Supplemental re #1 Notice of Removal by Kimberly Pace Baucom on behalf of Fairfax County Police Department, Edwin C. Roessler, Jr, Sgt Joe. Shoemaker (Baucom, Kimberly)
December 7, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (ahas)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7528347.), filed by Edwin C. Roessler, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Baucom, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duale v. Roessler, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin C. Roessler, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly Pace Baucom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfax County Police Department
Represented By: Kimberly Pace Baucom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Police Officer 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Police Officer 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Police Officer 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Police Officer 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Police Officer 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Joe. Shoemaker
Represented By: Kimberly Pace Baucom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filsan Duale
Represented By: Billy Bernard Ruhling, II
Represented By: Miles Jarrad Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?