Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc. v. Reta
Plaintiff: Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc. d/b/a Ethiopian Satellite Television and Radio and Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc. doing business as Ethiopian Satellite Television and Radio
Defendant: Solomon Reta
Case Number: 1:2021cv00375
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED that the hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Standing to Sue, and Improper Venue, #9 , currently set for a hearing on Friday, June 18, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Wednesday, June 23, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., by Zoom, with additional scheduling and access instructions to be sent separately by e-mail. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/18/2021. (dvanm, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Because Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Plan #13 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 19, 2021, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's April 22, 2021, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their respective Discovery Plans, the Court makes the following rulings: Plaintiff's Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 5/18/2021. (lgue, )
May 18, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Standing to Sue, and Improper Venue. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
May 18, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Standing to Sue, and Improper Venue. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2021 at 10:00 AM via Zoom in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (per order #18 ) (dvanm, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Standing to Sue, and Improper Venue filed by Solomon Reta. (Simms, Jonathan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Standing to Sue, and Improper Venue (Simms, Jonathan)
May 13, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Discovery Plan by Solomon Reta.(Davis, James)
May 12, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Discovery Plan by Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc..(Moore, Samuel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 Opposition to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Standing to Sue, and Improper Venue, #10 Memorandum in Support, filed by Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Opposition)(Moore, Samuel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 9/10/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 4/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Standing to Sue, and Improper Venue filed by Solomon Reta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Declaration)(Simms, Jonathan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Standing to Sue, and Improper Venue by Solomon Reta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant)(Simms, Jonathan)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed James Kirby Davis for Solomon Reta. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/15/2021. (clar, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Davis and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7725995. by Solomon Reta. (Simms, Jonathan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Ashley Simms on behalf of Solomon Reta (Simms, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Attachments served on Solomon Reta on April 2, 2021, filed by Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc.. (Moore, Samuel)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Solomon Reta. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(aott)
March 26, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc. d/b/a Ethiopian Satellite Television and Radio. (Moore, Samuel) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/29/2021) (aott, ).
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc. d/b/a Ethiopian Satellite Television and Radio. (Moore, Samuel)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7692831.), filed by Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc. d/b/a Ethiopian Satellite Television and Radio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Moore, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc. v. Reta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Reta
Represented By: Jonathan Ashley Simms
Represented By: James Kirby Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc. d/b/a Ethiopian Satellite Television and Radio
Represented By: Samuel Collyns Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advocates for Democracy and Media, Inc. doing business as Ethiopian Satellite Television and Radio
Represented By: Samuel Collyns Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?