Parker v. Woodruff et al
Plaintiff: Ray Elbert Parker
Defendant: Lloyd Woodruff and Manuel Puscual
Case Number: 1:2021cv00452
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED that the action is DIMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; that Plaintiff's Motion to Terminate Plaintiff's Pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #21 is GRANTED; that for the reasons stated in Judge Nachmanoff's Report and Recommendation #20 , Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #3 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #13 , Plaintiff's Motions for Service #7 #17 and Plaintiff's Motion to Place CIM Group Rents and Utilities in Escrow #9 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 05/26/2021. (choy, )(c/s on 05/26/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 28 Waiver of Hearing in re #25 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
May 20, 2021 Filing 27 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(B) #25 , filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
May 20, 2021 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service by Ray Elbert Parker (choy, )
May 20, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(b), filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Proposed Order)(choy, )
May 19, 2021 Per RDA chambers motions set for 5/21/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ray Elbert Parker (choy, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #21 MOTION to Withdraw #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (choy, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 22 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of #21 MOTION to Withdraw #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Terminate Plaintiff's Pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #13 , filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter #2 Proposed Order) (choy, ).
May 17, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION filed by Ray Elbert Parker, #9 MOTION filed by Ray Elbert Parker, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ray Elbert Parker, #17 MOTION filed by Ray Elbert Parker Objections to R&R due by 6/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 05/17/2021. (choy, )
May 17, 2021 Per RDA chambers motions set for 5/21/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
May 4, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #17 Second Motion for Service of April 9, 2021 Complaint by the United States Marshall Service. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (Per RDA chambers) (clar, )
May 4, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan. #17 Second Motion for Service of April 9, 2021 Complaint by the United States Marshall Service (clar, )
May 4, 2021 Per TCB chambers motions set for 5/7/2021 have been removed (clar, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #17 MOTION : Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (choy, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 18 Memorandum of Points and Authorities to #17 MOTION filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 17 Second Motion for Service of April 9, 2021 Complaint by the United States Marshall Service, filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Proposed Order)(choy, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (choy, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Exhibits) (choy, ).
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acceptance of the United States Magistrate Except for Trial by Jury and Final Disposition, filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(choy, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing in re #9 MOTION to Place CIM Group Rents and Utilities in Escrow. (choy, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Place CIM Group Rents and Utilities in Escrow filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Place CIM Group Rents and Utilities in Escrow, filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(choy, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Use the United States Marshall Service in Forma Pauperis for Service of the New Case Complaint File with Clerk April 9, 2021 filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Use the United States Marshall Service in Forma Pauperis for Service of the New Case Complaint File with Clerk April 9, 2021, filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(choy, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing in re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (choy, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ray Elbert Parker. (choy, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachment(s) : #1 Proposed Order) (choy, ).
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 14683089590. (kgall)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lloyd Woodruff and Manuel Puscual ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number XXXXXXXXX.), filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A-M, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope) (lber)
April 9, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Woodruff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Puscual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Elbert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?