Maplebear Inc. v. Does 1-2
Plaintiff: Maplebear Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Instacart
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Case Number: 1:2021cv00474
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jennifer Machlin Cecil for Maplebear Inc.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 06/04/2021. (clar, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 32 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Cecil and Certification of Local Counsel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7825599. by Maplebear Inc.. (Milewski, Julia)
May 10, 2021 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Remote Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 5/10/2021. Counsel for Plaintiff appeared via Zoom. Preliminary Injunction is granted. #26 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants is granted. Order entered. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SO ORDERED Plaintiff shall have until 120 days from the date of this Order to conduct discovery necessary to further identify and serve the Doe Defendants (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 5/10/2021. (lber)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 5/10/2021. (lber)
May 7, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE by Maplebear Inc. re #26 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants (Milewski, Julia)
May 7, 2021 Filing 27 Brief in Support to #26 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants filed by Maplebear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Milewski, Julia)
May 7, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants by Maplebear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milewski, Julia)
May 7, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE by Maplebear Inc. of Submission of Materials In Advance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Notice of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Milewski, Julia)
April 28, 2021 Filing 24 Docketed in Error per counsel. Pro Hac Vice Modified on 4/28/2021 (lber).
April 27, 2021 Filing 23 Bond Receipt. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (lber)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Gabriel M. Ramsey for Maplebear Inc.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 04/23/2021. (clar, )
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Warrington Parker for Maplebear Inc.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 04/23/2021. (clar, )
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kayvan Ghaffari for Maplebear Inc.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 04/23/2021. (clar, )
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Diane Aguirre-Dominguez for Maplebear Inc.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 04/23/2021. (clar, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark 4,903,628. (lber)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 4/20/2021. (Attachment: #1 Appendix A) (dzir).
April 20, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Remote Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2021 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex-Parte filed by Maplebear Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff appeared via Zoom. Motion argued and granted. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Order to follow. (Court Reporter T. Harris)(dzir)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex-Parte: Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 4/19/2021. (dzir)
April 16, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lber)
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Hearing Date re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex-Parte (Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 Declaration re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex-Parte Declaration of Kayvan Ghaffari by Maplebear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex-Parte Declaration of Henry Levin by Maplebear Inc.. (Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex-Parte Declaration of Adam Gayde by Maplebear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-Appendix A)(Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex-Parte Declaration of Dylan Tonti by Maplebear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex-Parte filed by Maplebear Inc.. (Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex-Parte by Maplebear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maplebear Inc.. (Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Diane Aguirre-Dominguez and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7730378. by Maplebear Inc.. (Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kayvan Ghaffari and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7730367. by Maplebear Inc.. (Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Warrington Parker and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7730357. by Maplebear Inc.. (Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabriel Ramsey and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7730344. by Maplebear Inc.. (Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Rebecca Milewski on behalf of Maplebear Inc. (Milewski, Julia)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against John Does 1-2, Controlling and Operating a Malicious Application Known as Shopper Helper ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7730286.), filed by Maplebear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Milewski, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maplebear Inc. v. Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maplebear Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Instacart
Represented By: Julia Rebecca Milewski
Represented By: Warrington Parker
Represented By: Gabriel M. Ramsey
Represented By: Jennifer Machlin Cecil
Represented By: Diane Aguirre-Dominguez
Represented By: Kayvan Ghaffari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?