KIRBY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Plaintiff: Maria Luz Kirby
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kimberly Zanotti, Secretary of DHS Alejandro Mayorkas and Tracy Renaud
Case Number: 1:2021cv00555
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 So Ordered re #15 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kimberly Zanotti, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/27/2021. (dvanm, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kimberly Zanotti. (Mezger, Matthew)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Execution of Settlement Agreement. ORDERED that if this action is not previously dismissed, the parties shall submit a joint report to this Court within ninety (90) days of the entry of this order, and every sixty (60) days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/17/2021. (dvanm, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Execution of Settlement Agreement by Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kimberly Zanotti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mezger, Matthew)
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Mezger on behalf of Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kimberly Zanotti (Mezger, Matthew)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Leon Fresco for Maria Luz Kirby. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/04/2021. (clar, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Leon Fresco and Certification of Local Counsel Amy L. Fuentes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7767676. by Maria Luz Kirby. (Fuentes, Amy)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Fuentes on behalf of Maria Luz Kirby (Fuentes, Amy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-00414. Original file and docket sheet received.
May 3, 2021 Notification of transfer of civil case from the District of Columbia Case No. 1:21cv414 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case; granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot #5 Motion. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 15, 2021. (lccjn2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/3/2021.]
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case, MOTION for Extension of Time by ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI. (McBride, Patricia). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 3/25/2021 (zjf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/3/2021.]
March 25, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #6 Motion to Transfer Case; emailed to patricia.mcbride@usdoj.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. DO NOT REFILE- FYI, Counsel is reminded to select all parts of their filing(s) (zjf, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/3/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case Eastern District of Virginia MOTION to Dismiss by ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI. (McBride, Patricia). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 3/24/2021 (eg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/3/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 24, 2021. (lccjn2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/3/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/17/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/18/2021. (Fresco, Leon) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/3/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/3/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8209285) filed by Maria Luz Kirby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Summons DOJ, #7 Summons US Atty, #8 Summons USCIS, #9 Summons Renaud, #10 Summons Zanotti, #11 Summons DHS, #12 Summons Mayorkas)(Fresco, Leon) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/3/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIRBY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Zanotti
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Luz Kirby
Represented By: Leon Fresco
Represented By: Amy L. Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?