Critical Power Group, Inc. v. Illig
Defendant: Shelly R Illig and John Younts
Counter Defendant: Critical Power Group, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Shelly Illig
Case Number: 1:2021cv00586
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
2 Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER in re #34 Stipulation of Dismissal. ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/2/2022. (kgall)
June 1, 2022 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint, as to All Claims and Counterclaims) by Shelly Illig. (Hoffman, Howard)
May 23, 2022 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to John Younts, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb)
May 17, 2022 Filing 32 Proposed Summons re #31 Counterclaim, by Shelly Illig. (Hoffman, Howard)
May 17, 2022 Filing 31 COUNTERCLAIM against Critical Power Group, Inc., John Younts, COUNTERCLAIM against Critical Power Group, Inc., John Younts, filed by Shelly Illig.(Hoffman, Howard)
May 17, 2022 Notice of Correction re #30 Counterclaim, Amended Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file the document separately for each motion relief. (nneb)
May 16, 2022 Filing 30 COUNTERCLAIM against Critical Power Group, Inc., John Younts Critical Power Group, Inc., John Younts, COUNTERCLAIM against Critical Power Group, Inc., John Younts Critical Power Group, Inc., John Younts, AMENDED COMPLAINT against Critical Power Group, Inc., John Younts, filed by Shelly Illig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Prosposed Summons for John Younts)(Hoffman, Howard)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Add Counterclaim; it is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file her amended answer and counterclaim as a separate docket entry; and it is further ORDERED that the May 20, 2022, hearing on defendant's motion is canceled (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/16/2022. (nneb)
May 11, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Add Counterclaim filed by Shelly Illig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2, #3 Exhibit Exh. 2-1)(Hoffman, Howard)
May 5, 2022 Filing 27 Rule 26 Disclosure by Critical Power Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hudgins, David)
May 5, 2022 Filing 26 Opposition to #23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Add Counterclaim, #24 Memorandum in Support, filed by Critical Power Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hudgins, David)
April 21, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Add Counterclaim. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
April 21, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Add Counterclaim (clar, )
April 21, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 20, 2022 re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Add Counterclaim, #24 Memorandum in Support, (Hoffman, Howard)
April 21, 2022 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Add Counterclaim filed by Shelly Illig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer and Counterclaim)(Hoffman, Howard)
April 21, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Add Counterclaim by Shelly Illig. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Howard)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Joint Discovery Plan (Docket no. 21), and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 20), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 03/17/2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.(wgar)
March 16, 2022 Filing 21 Joint Discovery Plan by Shelly Illig.(Hoffman, Howard)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Discovery due by 7/15/2022. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Consent Form)(kgall)
November 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Magistrate Judge Michael S. (MJ)Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (jlan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 19 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Critical Power Group, Inc.. (Hudgins, David)
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Shelly Illig.(Hoffman, Howard)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as to Counts I-VI and Count VIII; granting as to Counts VII and Count IX. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/20/2021. (see Order for further details). (nneb)
September 15, 2021 Per CMH Chambers motion set for 9/17/21 on papers. (klau, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shelly Illig. (Hoffman, Howard)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the parties' #13 Motion to Continue is GRANTED. ORDERED that the hearing date for defendant's Motion to Dismiss is continued from July 30, 2021 until September 17, 2021. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/26/21. (klau, )
July 26, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (klau, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Critical Power Group, Inc.. (Hudgins, David)
July 23, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Critical Power Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Proposed Order)(Hudgins, David) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (klau, ).
July 23, 2021 Filing 12 Opposition to #10 Memorandum in Support, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Critical Power Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hudgins, David)
July 9, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date set for 07/30/2021 re #10 Memorandum in Support, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hoffman, Howard)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shelly Illig. (Hoffman, Howard)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Shelly Illig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Howard)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that Defendant shall file a responsive pleading no later than July 9, 2021.Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 6/28/2021. (lcre, )
June 28, 2021 Shelly Illig answer due 7/9/2021. (lcre, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Shelly Illig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Howard)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Shelly Illig on 06/04/2021, filed by Critical Power Group, Inc.. (Hudgins, David)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Compliance of Secretary of Commonwealth as to Shelly Illig filed. (klau, )
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Critical Power Group, Inc. as to Shelly Illig. (Hudgins, David)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Shelly Illig. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Critical Power Group, Inc.. (Hudgins, David)
May 11, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against Shelly Illig ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7780133.), filed by Critical Power Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudgins, David) Modified text on 5/11/2021 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Critical Power Group, Inc. v. Illig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly R Illig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Younts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Critical Power Group, Inc.
Represented By: David D. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shelly Illig
Represented By: Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?