Microsoft Corporation v. John Does 1-2 Controlling A Computer Network Thereby Injuring Plaintiff And Its Customers
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: John Does 1-2 Controlling A Computer Network Thereby Injuring Plaintiff And Its Customers
Case Number: 1:2021cv00822
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion and Supporting Memorandum for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery; ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be permitted a discovery period of 180 days, during which it will move forward diligently with subpoenas to email service providers, domain name registrars, hosting companies and payment providers in an attempt to further identify Defendants and/or to obtain additional contact information through which to effect service of process (see order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 07/30/2021. (jlan)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDERED that the Court GRANTS Microsoft's preliminary injunction request. And IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Preliminary Injunction shall remain in effect until further order of the Court (See order for details) in regards to #1 Plaintiff Microsoft Corporations complaint for injunctive relief. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 07/30/2021. (jlan) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(jlan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/28/2021. Matter on for a Preliminary Injunction hearing. Appearance of Counsel for Plaintiff. Preliminary Injunction Granted. Counsel to submit a proposed order to the Court. (Court Reporter: T. Harris)(tarm)
July 26, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants . Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Date re #23 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants (Milewski, Julia)
July 26, 2021 Filing 24 Brief in Support to #23 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Milewski, Julia)
July 26, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milewski, Julia)
July 26, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of [Proposed] Preliminary Injunction Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Milewski, Julia)
July 26, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Service of Complaint and Pleadings re Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Milewski, Julia)
July 26, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David William O'Brien on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (O'Brien, David)
July 19, 2021 Filing 19 BOND in the amount of $ 50,000 posted by Microsoft Corporation on 07/19/2021. (choy, )
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #7 Motion for TRO; The Defendants shall appear before this Court on July 28, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., to show cause, if there is any, why this Court should not enter a Preliminary Injunction, pending final ruling on the Complaint against Defendants, enjoining Defendants from the conduct temporarily restrained by the preceding provisions of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Microsoft shall post a bond in the amount of $50,000.00 to be paid into the Court registry; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file with the Court and serve on Microsoft's counsel any answering affidavits, pleadings, motions, expert reports or declarations and/or legal memoranda no later than one (1) day prior to the hearing on Microsoft's request for a preliminary injunction; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect until the date for the preliminary injunction hearing set forth above, or until such further date as set by the Court or stipulated to by the parties. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/16/2021. (See Order for details) (tarm)
July 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Amended [Proposed] Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Milewski, Julia)
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2021 re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Microsoft Corporation. Appearance of counsel for Plaintiff. Pltf adduced evidence through: Donal Keating. Motion granted, Counsel to draft an order and submit to the Court. Bond will be set for $50,000. Matter set for a Preliminary Injunction hearing on 7/28/2021 at 10:00. (Court Reporter: T. Harris.)(tarm, )
July 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines - Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr.. (tarm)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Matthew B. Welling for Microsoft Corporation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 07/15/2021. (clar, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Gabriel M. Ramsey for Microsoft Corporation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 07/15/2021. (clar, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kayvan Ghaffari for Microsoft Corporation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 07/15/2021. (clar, )
July 13, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
July 13, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Hearing Date Amended re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Matthew Welling by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Donal Keating by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microsoft Corporation. (Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kayvan Ghaffari and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7887345. by Microsoft Corporation. (Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Welling and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7887343. by Microsoft Corporation. (Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabriel Ramsey and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7887341. by Microsoft Corporation. (Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Rebecca Milewski on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7887327.), filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Milewski, Julia)
July 13, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (choy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. John Does 1-2 Controlling A Computer Network Thereby Injuring Plaintiff And Its Customers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Julia Rebecca Milewski
Represented By: David William O'Brien
Represented By: Gabriel M. Ramsey
Represented By: Kayvan Ghaffari
Represented By: Matthew B. Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2 Controlling A Computer Network Thereby Injuring Plaintiff And Its Customers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?