Daiichi Sankyo, Inc. et al v. United States Patent and Trademark Office et al
Plaintiff: Daiichi Sankyo, Inc. and Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Defendant: USPTO, Department of Commerce, Andrew Hirshfeld and United States Patent and Trademark Office
Case Number: 1:2021cv00899
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrew Hirshfeld, United States Patent and Trademark Office, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(swil)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons re #5 Amended Complaint, to Office of the General Counsel, United States Patent and Trademark Office by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Daiichi Sankyo, Inc.. (Pade, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #5 Amended Complaint, to RAJ PAREKH, Acting United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Daiichi Sankyo, Inc.. (Pade, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #5 Amended Complaint, to MERRICK B. GARLAND, Attorney General of the United States by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Daiichi Sankyo, Inc.. (Pade, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #5 Amended Complaint, to ANDREW HIRSHFELD, in his official capacity as Performing the Functions and Duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Daiichi Sankyo, Inc.. (Pade, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Hirshfeld, United States Patent and Trademark Office, filed by Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Pade, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. (Bennett, Edward)
August 6, 2021 Notice of Correction re 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing user has been notified that document 3 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (lber)
August 5, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lber)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 REMOVED - Corporate Disclosure Statement by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. (Bennett, Edward) Modified on 8/6/2021 (lber).
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Daiichi Sankyo, Inc.. (Pade, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7930893.), filed by Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Pade, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daiichi Sankyo, Inc. et al v. United States Patent and Trademark Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daiichi Sankyo, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Arthur Pade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Represented By: Edward John Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPTO, Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hirshfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Patent and Trademark Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?