Dempsey et al v. Gerber Products Company
Plaintiff: Hannah Dempsey and Kathleen Hood
Defendant: Gerber Products Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01080
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hannah Dempsey, Kathleen Hood. Gerber Products Company waiver sent on 9/27/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Phelan, Michael)
September 28, 2021 Case Reassigned to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson no longer assigned to the case. (aott)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gerber Products Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
September 23, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (choy, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Hannah Dempsey, Kathleen Hood. (Phelan, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8013282.), filed by Hannah Dempsey, Kathleen Hood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum)(Phelan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dempsey et al v. Gerber Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Dempsey
Represented By: Michael G. Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Hood
Represented By: Michael G. Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?