Smith v. Virginia Dept. of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Allen Angel Smith
Defendant: Virginia Department of Corrections and Julie Fink
Case Number: 1:2021cv01126
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:21-cv-00450. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2021: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ).
October 7, 2021 Notification of transfer of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus from the Western District of VA Case No. 7:21cv450 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order transferring case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge James P. Jones on 10/5/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/7/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Allen Angel Smith (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/7/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/25/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/7/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 Verified Statement by Plaintiff Allen Angel Smith (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/7/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report and statement of Assets by Allen Angel Smith (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/7/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Julie Fink, Virginia Dept. of Corrections, filed by Allen Angel Smith. (Attachments: #1 Grievances)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Virginia Dept. of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Angel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?