Elston v. Elston
Defendant: Emily Sherra Weeks Elston
Petitioner: Kerry Ross Elston
Case Number: 1:2021cv01203
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 12/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Consent Form)(kgall)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED to the extent that the Court will issue a scheduling order on this matter. The children shall not be removed from this jurisdiction until further notice of this Court. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 12/10/2021. (lber)
December 9, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Emily Sherra Weeks Elston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dougherty, Donna)
December 2, 2021 Filing 14 Letter to the court re acceptance of service. (Zahr, Rami) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (lber).
December 1, 2021 Per CMH chambers motions set for 12/3/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
November 26, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #8 First MOTION Motion to Permit Petitioner to Appear Remotely by Kerry Ross Elston (Zahr, Rami) Modified on 11/29/2021 (lber).
November 26, 2021 Notice of Correction re #12 Waiver of Oral Argument. The filing user has been notified to refile a new Waiver of Oral Argument. (lber)
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 Docketed in Error and Removed. (lber) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/26/2021) (lber, ).
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 Reply to Motion re #6 Amended MOTION to Expedite filed by Emily Sherra Weeks Elston. (Dougherty, Donna)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 Reply to Motion re #8 First MOTION Motion to Permit Petitioner to Appear Remotely filed by Emily Sherra Weeks Elston. (Dougherty, Donna)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Dougherty on behalf of Emily Sherra Weeks Elston (Dougherty, Donna)
November 22, 2021 Notice of Correction re #8 First MOTION Motion to Permit Petitioner to Appear Remotely . Filing user have been notified to file either a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (lber)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION Motion to Permit Petitioner to Appear Remotely by Kerry Ross Elston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zahr, Rami)
November 12, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 Amended MOTION to Expedite . Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date 12/3/2021 re #6 Amended MOTION to Expedite (Zahr, Rami)
November 12, 2021 Notice of Correction re #5 MOTION to Expedite, #4 MOTION to Expedite, #6 Amended MOTION to Expedite. The filing user has been notified to file Notice of Hearing's as a separate entry in the future. (lber)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 Amended MOTION to Expedite by Kerry Ross Elston. (Attachments: #1 Praecipe, #2 Notice of Hearing, #3 Proposed Order)(Zahr, Rami)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite by Kerry Ross Elston. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing Date, #2 Proposed Order)(Zahr, Rami) Modified text on 12/10/2021 (lber).
November 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Magistrate Judge Michael S. (MJ)Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (jlan)
October 29, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lber )
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite by Kerry Ross Elston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zahr, Rami)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rami Zahr on behalf of Kerry Ross Elston (Zahr, Rami)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Kerry Ross Elston. (Zahr, Rami)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8075937.), filed by Kerry Ross Elston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Motion to Expedite, #3 Proposed Order)(Zahr, Rami)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elston v. Elston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kerry Ross Elston
Represented By: Rami Zahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Sherra Weeks Elston
Represented By: Donna Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?