Getir U.S., Inc. et al v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Getir U.S., Inc. and Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S.
Defendant: John Doe, getir190.com and 190getir.com
Case Number: 1:2021cv01237
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Service for December 13, 2021 Order (Dkt. 38) served on Publication in Washington Times on December 16, 2021, filed by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Weigand, Kevin)
December 23, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc. of Issuance of Subpoena to TaskRabbit, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weigand, Kevin)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/21/2021. (kgall)
December 17, 2021 Filing 40 Memorandum in Support re #39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weigand, Kevin)
December 17, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weigand, Kevin)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED that the hearing for a Preliminary Injunction currently scheduled for December 15, 2021 be terminated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants show cause, if there is any, why this Court should not enter a Preliminary Injunction, pending final ruling on the Complaint against Defendants, enjoining Defendants from the conduct temporarily restrained by Order issued by this Court on November 19, 2021. Dkt. 31 (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/13/2021. (lber)
December 13, 2021 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service for November 19, 2021 Order Granting TRO (Dkt. 31) served on Publication in Washington Times on November 24, 2021, filed by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Weigand, Kevin)
December 13, 2021 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for November 12, 2021 Order Granting TRO (Dkt. 20) served on Publication in Washington Times on November 17, 2021, filed by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Weigand, Kevin)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Seal (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/23/2021. (kgall)
November 23, 2021 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Seal filed by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Weigand, Kevin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 37 BOND in the amount of $500.00 posted by Getir U.S., Inc. (lber)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #22 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (See Order for details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/19/2021. (jlan)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Seal (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/18/2021. (kgall)
November 16, 2021 Filing 36 BOND in the amount of $500.00 posted by Getir U.S., Inc. (lber)
November 15, 2021 Filing 29 Sealed Document (Unredacted Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' November 15, 2021 Emergency Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order) re #26 MOTION to Seal . (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 28 Sealed Document (Unredacted Amended Complaint) re #26 MOTION to Seal . (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc. re #26 MOTION to Seal (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Seal by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 25 Declaration re #22 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte) of David King by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 24 Declaration re #22 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte) of Lynsey Schumacher by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte) filed by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted))(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 22 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte) by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted) against John Doe, getir190.com, 190getir.com, a domain name, filed by Getir U.S., Inc., Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., 190getir.com, a domain name. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/12/2021. (kgall)
November 12, 2021 Set Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (kgall)
November 9, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to getir190.com, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(kgall)
November 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Anthony Colaizzi on behalf of Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc. (Colaizzi, Roger)
November 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin William Weigand on behalf of Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc. (Weigand, Kevin)
November 8, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Summons by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Seal filed by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 Sealed Document (Unredacted Declaration of Mert Salur) re #8 MOTION to Seal. (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 Sealed Document (Unredacted Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) re #8 MOTION to Seal. (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 Sealed Document (Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) re #8 MOTION to Seal. (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 Sealed Document (Unredacted Complaint) re #8 MOTION to Seal. (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc. re #8 MOTION to Seal (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Seal by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 Report on the filing of an action. (kgall)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 Declaration re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex Parte of Mert Salur by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 Declaration re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex Parte of Lynsey Schumacher by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 Declaration re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex Parte of David King by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex Parte filed by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex Parte by Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S., Getir U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8091078.), filed by Getir U.S., Inc., Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DePalma, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles no longer assigned to the case. (nneb, )
November 8, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (kgall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Getir U.S., Inc. et al v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Getir U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Kevin William Weigand
Represented By: Roger Anthony Colaizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Martin DePalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Getir Perakende Lojistik A.S.
Represented By: Kevin William Weigand
Represented By: Roger Anthony Colaizzi
Represented By: Nicholas Martin DePalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: getir190.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 190getir.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?