Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research v. U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Plaintiff: Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research
Defendant: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Case Number: 1:2021cv01370
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint on or before Friday, February 11, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 01/10/2022. (choy, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levenson, Rebecca)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
December 8, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (choy, )
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Schrier, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (to US AG) by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Schrier, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (to US Atty, EDVA) by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Schrier, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (to SEC) by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Schrier, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8143434.), filed by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schrier, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research v. U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?