GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG et al v. Saunders
Plaintiff: GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG, Josip Heit, Antonio Euclides Menese De Gouveia, Michael Dalcoe and Antonio Euclides Menesis De Gouveia
Defendant: Christopher Saunders
Case Number: 1:2021cv01398
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date set for March 11, 2022 at 10:00am re #14 Memorandum in Support, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Mills, Laurin)
February 11, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Christopher Saunders. (Mills, Laurin)
February 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Christopher Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mills, Laurin)
January 19, 2022 FILED IN ERROR
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Green Hull on behalf of Michael Dalcoe, Antonio Euclides Menesis De Gouveia, GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG, Josip Heit (Hull, Emily)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant, Mr. Saunders, shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than February 11, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/14/2022. (shea)
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Rossi on behalf of Michael Dalcoe, Antonio Euclides Menesis De Gouveia, GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG, Josip Heit (Rossi, Eugene)
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by Christopher Saunders. (Mills, Laurin)
January 14, 2022 Notice of Correction re #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, ; The filing user has been notified to refile the memorandum in support separately. (shea)
January 13, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Christopher Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Consent Motion to Enlarge Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Mills, Laurin)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG, Michael Dalcoe, Antonio Euclides Menesis De Gouveia, Josip Heit Christopher Saunders served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022 (Rossi, Eugene)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John Cyril Maloney, Jr for Michael Dalcoe,John Cyril Maloney, Jr for Antonio Euclides Menesis De Gouveia,John Cyril Maloney, Jr for GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG,John Cyril Maloney, Jr for Josip Heit. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/21/2021. (clar, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Christopher Saunders, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John C. Maloney, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Eugene J. Rossi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8159423. by Michael Dalcoe, Antonio Euclides Menesis De Gouveia, GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG, Josip Heit. (Rossi, Eugene)
December 17, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (shea)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Michael Dalcoe, Antonio Euclides Menese De Gouveia, GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG, Josip Heit. (Rossi, Eugene)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Michael Dalcoe, Antonio Euclides Menese De Gouveia, GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG, Josip Heit. (Rossi, Eugene)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8157608.), filed by GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG, Michael Dalcoe, Antonio Euclides Menese De Gouveia, Josip Heit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Rossi, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG et al v. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GSB Gold Standard Corporation AG
Represented By: Eugene Rossi
Represented By: Emily Green Hull
Represented By: John Cyril Maloney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josip Heit
Represented By: Eugene Rossi
Represented By: Emily Green Hull
Represented By: John Cyril Maloney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Euclides Menese De Gouveia
Represented By: Eugene Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dalcoe
Represented By: Eugene Rossi
Represented By: Emily Green Hull
Represented By: John Cyril Maloney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Euclides Menesis De Gouveia
Represented By: Emily Green Hull
Represented By: John Cyril Maloney, Jr.
Represented By: Eugene Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Saunders
Represented By: Laurin Howard Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?