Aisenberg v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Aisenberg
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00125
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Funds
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order ("Joint Discovery Plan") (Docket no. 5), and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 4), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 03/10/2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 Joint Proposed Schedule and Discovery Plan by Michael Aisenberg.(Glass, Benjamin)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson.Discovery due by 6/14/2022.Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2022 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (If the parties do not file dispositive motions). Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2022 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (If the parties do file dispositive motions). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 03/01/2022. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Peter)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Moore, Peter)
February 4, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint for disability benefits under ERISA ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8230438.), filed by Michael Aisenberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glass, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aisenberg v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Aisenberg
Represented By: Benjamin Weaver Glass, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter Meredith Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?