Kirsanova v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al.
Defendant: Kateryna Kirsanova, UR M. Jaddou, Kimberly Zanotti, Field Office Director,, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Kimberly Zanotti
Case Number: 1:2022cv00130
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Kateryna Kirsanova Proof of Service Pursuant to FRCP 4(1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vasseghi, Roya)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed James Oliver Hacking, III for Kateryna Kirsanova. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 2/25/2022. (clar, )
February 24, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kimberly Zanotti, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (swil) (Attachments: #1 Summons Notice) (swil).
February 22, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Summons version 2 by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 22, 2022 Filing 11 Proposed Summons version 2 by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 22, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Summons version 2 by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons version 2 by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons version 2 by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James O. Hacking, III and Certification of Local Counsel Roya Vasseghi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8256222. by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 9, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Vasseghi, Roya)
February 7, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (choy, )
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8231876.), filed by Kateryna Kirsanova. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vasseghi, Roya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirsanova v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kateryna Kirsanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Zanotti, Field Office Director,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Zanotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?