Gaebel v. United States Polo Association
Plaintiff: Darrell Gaebel
Defendant: United States Polo Association
Case Number: 1:2022cv00141
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Opposition to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Darrell Gaebel. (Peacock, Skyler)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Continue is GRANTED and the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 21] is continued to April 29, 2022, at 10:00 am. Plaintiff's brief in opposition shall now be due by no later than April 1, 2022, and Defendant's brief in reply shall be due by no later than April 14, 2022 (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/2022. (shea)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 21] by Darrell Gaebel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Order)(Peacock, Skyler)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (shea, )
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Date re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #24 Order (Fields, Heather)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED that defendant re-notice a hearing on the Motion for the first permissible Friday in April. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/14/2022. (shea)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 6, 2022 re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Fields, Heather)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by United States Polo Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dx. 1 - Pages 233-234 from USPA 2021 Rulebook, #2 Exhibit Dx. 2 - Pages 15 - 38 from USPA 2021 Rulebook, #3 Exhibit Dx. 3 - Summary of Final Order, #4 Exhibit Dx. 4 - Complaint 061CL21000436-00)(Fields, Heather)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by United States Polo Association. (Fields, Heather)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Video Recordings. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/8/2022. (kgall)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jude Chukwuka Nwaokobia for Darrell Gaebel. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 03/07/2022. (clar, )
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jude Nwaokobia and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas Bick Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8277996. by Darrell Gaebel. (Bick, Thomas)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 8] be and is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/4/2022. (shea)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by United States Polo Association re #14 Order (Fields, Heather)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Video Recordings by Darrell Gaebel. (Bick, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that defendant promptly notify the Court in writing whether it intends to proceed with its current Motion to Dismiss or file a revised motion based on the Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/3/2022. (shea)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT Darrell Gaebel against United States Polo Association, filed by Darrell Gaebel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPA Constitution, #2 Exhibit USPA DPP, #3 Exhibit USPA Notice and Charges, #4 Exhibit Emails, #5 Exhibit Disciplinary Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit USPA Final Order, #7 Exhibit Videos (To Be Filed Manually))(Peacock, Skyler)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Quendale George Simmons for Darrell Gaebel. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/18/2022. (clar, )
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Skyler Peacock on behalf of Darrell Gaebel (Peacock, Skyler)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Lowell Spurlock-Brown on behalf of Darrell Gaebel (Spurlock-Brown, John)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (shea)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by United States Polo Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dx. 1 - Pages 233-234 from USPA 2021 Rulebook, #2 Exhibit Dx. 2 - Pages 15 - 38 from USPA 2021 Rulebook, #3 Exhibit Dx. 3 - Complaint 061CL21000436-00)(Fields, Heather)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by United States Polo Association. (Fields, Heather)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Quendale Simmons and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas Bick Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8248040. by Darrell Gaebel. (Bick, Thomas)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ian Dumain for United States Polo Association. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/14/2022. (clar, )
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Mary Katherine George for United States Polo Association. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/14/2022. (clar, )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Katherine George and Certification of Local Counsel Heather M. Fields Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8242725. by United States Polo Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - George Pro Hac Vice Application)(Fields, Heather)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian M. Dumain and Certification of Local Counsel Heather M. Fields Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8242693. by United States Polo Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Dumain Pro Hac Vice Application)(Fields, Heather)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (shea)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Polo Association. (Fields, Heather)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8237104.), filed by United States Polo Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fields, Heather) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/10/2022) (shea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaebel v. United States Polo Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Gaebel
Represented By: Mark Roman Dycio
Represented By: John Lowell Spurlock-Brown
Represented By: Jude Chukwuka Nwaokobia
Represented By: Quendale George Simmons
Represented By: Skyler Peacock
Represented By: Thomas Kennedy Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Polo Association
Represented By: Heather Fields
Represented By: Ian Dumain
Represented By: Mary Katherine George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?