Giango v. Orler et al
Plaintiff: Winnie Jungay Giango
Defendant: Maria F Orler, Robert M Orler, Edward M Orler, Maria F. Orler, Robert M. Orler and Edward M. Orler
Case Number: 1:2022cv00164
Filed: February 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Filing 16 Rule 26 Disclosure by Maria F. Orler, Robert M. Orler. (Hennessy, Thomas)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 14) and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 13) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by Friday, July 15, 2022. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The the pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, April 6, 2022 at 11 :00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(l) disclosures shall be completed by Wednesday, April 6, 2022. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 3/31/22. (tfitz, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 14 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Maria F. Orler, Robert M. Orler.(Hennessy, Thomas)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2022 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. Discovery due by 7/15/2022. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 3/17/2022. (lcre, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2022: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice) (lcre, ).
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 So Ordered re #11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE of Claims Against Defendant Edward R. Orler Only by Winnie Jungay Giango. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 3/17/2022. (lber)
March 16, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Edward R. Orler Only by Winnie Jungay Giango (Sutter, Matthew)
March 11, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. (clar, )
March 11, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date re #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 Memorandum in Support (Hennessy, Thomas)
March 10, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Maria F. Orler, Robert M. Orler.(Hennessy, Thomas)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edward M. Orler. (Hennessy, Thomas)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Edward M. Orler. (Hennessy, Thomas)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Winnie Jungay Giango Edward M. Orler served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022 (Sutter, Matthew)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Winnie Jungay Giango Robert M. Orler served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022 (Sutter, Matthew)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Winnie Jungay Giango Maria F. Orler served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022 (Sutter, Matthew)
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Edward M. Orler, Maria F. Orler, Robert M. Orler, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Suit) (lber)
February 15, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lber)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Winnie Jungay Giango. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sutter, Matthew)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8247178.), filed by Winnie Jungay Giango. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giango v. Orler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winnie Jungay Giango
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria F Orler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Orler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M Orler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria F. Orler
Represented By: Thomas Francis Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Orler
Represented By: Thomas Francis Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Orler
Represented By: Thomas Francis Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?