Etherton v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Etherton
Defendant: President Joseph R. Biden, Office of Head Start, Ph.D Bernadine Futrell, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN & FAMILIES, Jooyeun Chang, Department of Health & Human Services, Xavier Beccera, Joseph R. Biden, Bernadine Futrell and Joo Yeun Chang
Case Number: 1:2022cv00195
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Etherton.(Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2022 Notice of Correction re #28 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. The filing user has been notified that documents provided are proof of mailing and not of service. The filing user was directed to refile once proof of service has been obtained from USPS tracking. (dvanm)
March 30, 2022 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Etherton. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibit)(Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2022 Filing 27 Withdrawal of Motion by Elizabeth Etherton re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2022 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Administration for Children & Families, Xavier Beccera, Joseph R. Biden, Joo Yeun Chang, Department of Health & Human Services, Bernadine Futrell, Office of Head Start. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Burke Declaration))(Levenson, Rebecca)
March 15, 2022 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm)
March 11, 2022 Filing 24 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint re Administration for Children and Families by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 23 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint re U.S. Attorney General by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 22 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint re Department of Health and Human Services by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 21 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint re Civil Process Clerk by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 20 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint re JooYeun Chang by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 19 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint re Joseph R. Biden by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 18 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint re Bernadine Futrell by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 17 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Office of Head Start by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 16 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Xavier Becerra by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
March 1, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 1, 2022 re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #14 Memorandum in Support (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Elizabeth Etherton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for a Briefing and Hearing Schedule for her Forthcoming Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/1/2022. (see order for details) (dvanm)
March 1, 2022 Set Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (see order #12 for details) (dvanm)
February 28, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION Briefing and Hearing Schedule Unopposed by Elizabeth Etherton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jennings, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Daniel Robert Suhr for Elizabeth Etherton. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/25/2022. (clar, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion Withdraw Notice of Hearing. ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 9:00 AM on Monday, February 28, 2022, be and is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/25/2022. (kgall) (C/S pursuant to Order)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION Withdraw Notice of Hearing re #3 Notice of Hearing Date, #6 Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, Unopposed by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel R. Suhr and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey D. Jennings Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8264096. by Elizabeth Etherton. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER On February 23, 2022, plaintiff filed a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (the Motion") [Dkt. No. 2] and noticed a hearing for Monday, February 28, 2022, at 10:00 AM. Because the Court is not available for a hearing at 10:00 AM that day, it is hereby ORDERED that the hearing on plaintiff's Motion be and is accelerated to 9:00 AM on Monday, February 28, 2022. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/25/22. (yguy)
February 25, 2022 ***Motion Hearing for 2/28/2022 terminated (kgall)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service Amended re #4 Memorandum in Support, #3 Notice of Hearing Date, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jeffrey Daniel Jennings on behalf of Elizabeth Etherton (Jennings, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Elizabeth Etherton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Jennings, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2022 Notice of Correction re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The filing user has been notified to file the memorandum separately.(dvanm)
February 23, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Hearing Date re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Jennings, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Elizabeth Etherton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration and Exhibits)(Jennings, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/25/2022 (yguy, ).
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8258904.), filed by Elizabeth Etherton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jennings, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etherton v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Etherton
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Jennings
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Joseph R. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Head Start
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ph.D Bernadine Futrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN & FAMILIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jooyeun Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Beccera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadine Futrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joo Yeun Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?