Kelly et al v. The City of Alexandria
Plaintiff: Anthony Kelly, Gregory Cook, Gerald Fair, Jack Hoffman, Christopher Kunkle, Chad Lallier, David Plunkett, Samuel Reyes, Frederick Ruff and Michael Sharpe
Defendant: The City of Alexandria
Case Number: 1:2022cv00196
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 Joint Discovery Plan by Gregory Cook, Gerald Fair, Jack Hoffman, Anthony Kelly, Christopher Kunkle, Chad Lallier, David Plunkett, Samuel Reyes, Frederick Ruff, Michael Sharpe.(Mundaca, Francisco)
April 7, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by The City of Alexandria. (Dabbs, David)
March 17, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by The City of Alexandria.(Dabbs, David)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ivey Best for Gregory Cook,Ivey Best for Gerald Fair,Ivey Best for Jack Hoffman,Ivey Best for Anthony Kelly,Ivey Best for Christopher Kunkle,Ivey Best for Chad Lallier,Ivey Best for David Plunkett,Ivey Best for Samuel Reyes,Ivey Best for Frederick Ruff,Ivey Best for Michael Sharpe. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 03/08/2022. (clar, )
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for Gregory Cook,Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for Gerald Fair,Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for Jack Hoffman,Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for Anthony Kelly,Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for Christopher Kunkle,Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for Chad Lallier,Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for David Plunkett,Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for Samuel Reyes,Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for Frederick Ruff,Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci for Michael Sharpe. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 03/08/2022. (clar, )
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, and Complaint with Exhibit A served on The City of Alexandria c/o Joanna Anderson, City Attorney on 2/24/2022, filed by Gregory Cook, Gerald Fair, Jack Hoffman, Anthony Kelly, Christopher Kunkle, Chad Lallier, David Plunkett, Samuel Reyes, Frederick Ruff, Michael Sharpe. (Mundaca, Francisco)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ivey Best and Certification of Local Counsel Francisco Mundaca Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8264794. by Gregory Cook, Gerald Fair, Jack Hoffman, Anthony Kelly, Christopher Kunkle, Chad Lallier, David Plunkett, Samuel Reyes, Frederick Ruff, Michael Sharpe. (Mundaca, Francisco)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The City of Alexandria, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb)
February 23, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (nneb)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert W.T. Tucci and Certification of Local Counsel Francisco Mundaca Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8259320. by Gregory Cook, Gerald Fair, Jack Hoffman, Anthony Kelly, Christopher Kunkle, Chad Lallier, David Plunkett, Samuel Reyes, Frederick Ruff, Michael Sharpe. (Mundaca, Francisco)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Gregory Cook, Gerald Fair, Jack Hoffman, Anthony Kelly, Christopher Kunkle, Chad Lallier, David Plunkett, Samuel Reyes, Frederick Ruff, Michael Sharpe. (Mundaca, Francisco)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8259182.), filed by Chad Lallier, Gerald Fair, David Plunkett, Frederick Ruff, Gregory Cook, Samuel Reyes, Jack Hoffman, Anthony Kelly, Michael Sharpe, Christopher Kunkle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mundaca, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. The City of Alexandria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Kelly
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Cook
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Fair
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Hoffman
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kunkle
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Lallier
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Plunkett
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Reyes
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Ruff
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sharpe
Represented By: Francisco Egbert Mundaca
Represented By: Ivey Best
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Alexandria
Represented By: David Frederick Dabbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?