UBIQUITI INC. v. KREBS et al
Plaintiff: UBIQUITI INC.
Defendant: BRIAN KREBS and KREBS ON SECURITY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00352
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED that the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 9/7/2022. (nneb)
September 1, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Brian Krebs, Krebs on Security, LLC. (Wachen, David)
August 25, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #1 Complaint and for Status Conference by Brian Krebs, Krebs on Security, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wachen, David)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 2, 2022; and it is further ORDERED that no further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/3/2022. (nneb)
August 3, 2022 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #1 Complaint by Brian Krebs, Krebs on Security, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wachen, David)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants Brian Krebs and Krebs on Security, LLC shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 3, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 7/25/2022. (nneb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #1 Complaint by Brian Krebs, Krebs on Security, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wachen, David)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that Defendant Krebs on Security, LLC shall respond to the Complaint on or before July 20, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/3/2022. (nneb)
June 2, 2022 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Waiver of Service Executed, #1 Complaint, #9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Complaint by Krebs on Security, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wachen, David)
June 2, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ubiquiti Inc.. Brian Krebs waiver sent on 5/21/2022, answer due 7/20/2022. (Watkins, Daniel)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jay Marshall Wolman for Brian Krebs,Jay Marshall Wolman for Krebs on Security, LLC. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/12/2022. (clar, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Marc John Randazza for Brian Krebs,Marc John Randazza for Krebs on Security, LLC. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/12/2022. (clar, )
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jay Marshall Wolman and Certification of Local Counsel David S. Wachen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8383710. by Brian Krebs, Krebs on Security, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of PHV Motion)(Wachen, David)
May 10, 2022 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc John Randazza and Certification of Local Counsel David S. Wachen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8383694. by Brian Krebs, Krebs on Security, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of PHV Application)(Wachen, David)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Upon consideration of Defendant Krebs on Security, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time and the Court's finding good cause to grant the Motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant Krebs on Security, LLC shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/5/2022. (lgue, )
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension to Respond to Complaint by Krebs on Security, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wachen, David)
April 14, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Compliance received from Virginia State Corporation Commission, Krebs on Security, LLC served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (nneb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Arthur Clare on behalf of Ubiquiti Inc. (Clare, Thomas)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Brian Krebs, Krebs on Security, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb)
March 29, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (nneb)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by UBIQUITI INC.. (Watkins, Daniel)
March 29, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by UBIQUITI INC.. (Watkins, Daniel)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by UBIQUITI INC.. (Watkins, Daniel)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8318392.), filed by UBIQUITI INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watkins, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UBIQUITI INC. v. KREBS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UBIQUITI INC.
Represented By: Daniel Paul Watkins
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN KREBS
Represented By: David Scott Wachen
Represented By: Jay Marshall Wolman
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KREBS ON SECURITY, LLC
Represented By: David Scott Wachen
Represented By: Jay Marshall Wolman
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?