Ford v. Corizon Health Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monique Shenell Ford
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc., Richard B. Ashby, Lois Ntiamoah, Natasha Toy, Antoine Smith, Deputy Seaton Sok and Sheriff Elizabeth Arthur
Case Number: 1:2022cv00411
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER re: the handling and labeling of confidential material. (see Order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 6/7/22. (tfitz, )
June 2, 2022 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Richard B. Ashby, Corizon Health Inc., Lois Ntiamoah, Natasha Toy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by Richard B. Ashby, Corizon Health Inc., Lois Ntiamoah, Natasha Toy. (Muldowney, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Antoine Smith.(Essig, Michael)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 13) and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 11) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by Friday, September 9, 2022. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, May 11, 2022 at 11 :00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(l) disclosures shall be completed by Friday, May 27, 2022. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 5/6/22. (tfitz, )
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 Joint Discovery Plan by Elizabeth Arthur, Seaton Sok.(Francuzenko, Alexander)
May 3, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Timothy Essig on behalf of Antoine Smith (Essig, Michael)
April 27, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 5/11/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (per TCB chambers) (tfitz, )
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. Discovery due by 9/9/2022. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 4/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(tarm)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Natasha Toy.(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Lois Ntiamoah.(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Richard B. Ashby.(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Corizon Health Inc..(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Martin Muldowney on behalf of Richard B. Ashby, Corizon Health Inc., Lois Ntiamoah, Natasha Toy (Muldowney, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Seaton Sok.(Francuzenko, Alexander)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Elizabeth Arthur.(Francuzenko, Alexander)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Antoine Smith. Antoine Smith waiver sent on 4/15/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Silverman, Coreen)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by Elizabeth Arthur, Seaton Sok. (Francuzenko, Alexander)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8343177.), filed by Seaton Sok, Elizabeth Arthur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Francuzenko, Alexander)
April 13, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (kgall)
April 13, 2022 Notice of Correction in re #1 Notice of Removal - Filing counsel notified via email to file a civil coversheet. (kgall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Corizon Health Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Shenell Ford
Represented By: Daniel Guinnane Zemel
Represented By: Mark J. Krudys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc.
Represented By: Edward Joseph McNelis, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Martin Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Ashby
Represented By: Edward Joseph McNelis, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Martin Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Ntiamoah
Represented By: Edward Joseph McNelis, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Martin Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Toy
Represented By: Edward Joseph McNelis, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Martin Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Smith
Represented By: Coreen Antoinette Silverman
Represented By: Michael Timothy Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Seaton Sok
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Elizabeth Arthur
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?